Sabo v. Wellpet, LLC
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Elaine E Bucklo |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-08550 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2017 3:41 AM CST |
Defendant
Wellpet, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Sabo
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 21 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/21/2017. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) |
1. | Federal judge dismisses lawsuit against WellPet alleging company falsely marketed products as "Made in the USA" (petfoodindustry.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 05/08/2017 10:56 AM CDT |