Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:16-cv-14400
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2016
Terminated:Sep 25, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 28, 2017 3:28 AM CST
Consol Defendant
Capital One, N.A.
Represented By
Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Eric Flynn
Hunton & Williams (dallas)
contact info
Mark Samuel Goldstein
Lowe, Stein, Hoffman, Allweiss & Hauver, LLP
contact info
Alicia Martone Bendana
Lowe, Stein, Hoffman, Allweiss & Hauver, LLP
contact info
Conor T. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Kanetha Arun Chau
Represented By
Phillip Wallace
Phillip K. Wallace, Attorney At Law
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Sake 21, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Pho An, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Pad-Thai, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Chili Thai, Inc.
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Counter Claimant
Capital One
Represented By
Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Conor T. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Counter Defendant
Chili Thai, Inc.
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pad Thai, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pho An, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sake 21, LLC
Represented By
Stavros Panagoulopoulos
Pelican Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Capital One, N.A.
Represented By
Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Conor T. Lutkewitte
Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte
contact info
Plaintiff
Chili Thai, Inc.
Represented By
Phillip Wallace
Phillip K. Wallace, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Pho An, LLC
Represented By
Phillip Wallace
Phillip K. Wallace, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Pad Thai, LLC
Represented By
Phillip Wallace
Phillip K. Wallace, Attorney At Law
contact info

GPO Sep 25 2017
Letter) (Reference: 16-14400)(clc)ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the 83 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Case No. 16-14400 is remanded to the 22nd Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. Tammany, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Remand
GPO Sep 25 2017
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 92 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court is GRANTED. Case No. 16-14733 is REFERRED to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017.(Reference: 16-14733)(Attachment(s) added on 9/25/2017: # (1) Bankruptcy Letter) (clc).

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 25, 2017
107 107 trial Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Mon 09/25 3:16 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Kanetha Arun Chau. Related [+](Wallace, Phillip)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
106 106 5 pgs order Order Remanding Case to Bankruptcy Court Mon 09/25 3:14 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that92 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court is GRANTED. Case No. 16-14733 is REFERRED to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017 Related [+](Attachment(s) added on 9/25/2017: #1 Bankruptcy Letter) (clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
105 105 7 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 3:05 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Case No. 16-15802 be remanded to the 22nd Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. Tammany, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. Related [+](clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-15802
Att: 1 Remand Letter
104 104 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 09/25 2:59 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the83 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Case No. 16-14400 is remanded to the 22nd Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. Tammany, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. Related [+](clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14400
Att: 1 Remand Letter
103 103 misc Pretrial Memorandum Mon 09/25 2:58 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Kanetha Arun Chau. Related [+](Wallace, Phillip) Modified text on 9/25/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14400 16-14733
102 102 trial Trial Brief Mon 09/25 2:38 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Capital One, N.A. Related [+](Lutkewitte, Conor) Modified text on 9/25/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: All Cases
101 101 misc Objections Mon 09/25 2:08 PM
OBJECTIONS by Kanetha Arun Chau to Defendant, Capital One NA's Exhibits Related [+](Wallace, Phillip)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 156 or 1-A in Bench Books,
Att: 3 Exhibit 157 or 1-B in Bench Books
Friday, September 22, 2017
100 100 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/22 4:35 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Capital One, N.A. re92 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court . Related [+](Lutkewitte, Conor) Modified text on 9/22/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: All Cases
Thursday, September 21, 2017
99 99 trial Witness List Thu 09/21 2:01 PM
Final Witness List by Kanetha Arun Chau. Related [+](Wallace, Phillip) Modified text on 9/21/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14400 16-14733
98 98 trial Witness List Thu 09/21 1:03 PM
Final Witness List by Capital One, N.A. Related [+](Lutkewitte, Thomas) Modified text on 9/21/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733 16-15802
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
97 97 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 09/19 12:51 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re94 Supplemental Memorandum. **All CM/ECF Documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http:// www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-filesand- not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned** Related [+](clc)
Related: [-] ference: All Cases
96 96 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Tue 09/19 11:26 AM
ORDER granting93 Motion to Expedite Submission on92 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court to Remand. Defendant's Opposition, if any, must be filed no later than Friday, September 22, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/19/2017. Related [+](clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
Monday, September 18, 2017
95 95 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Sanctions Mon 09/18 4:39 PM
ORDER finding as moot76 Motion for Discovery and Sanctions. Before the Court is the Motion for Discovery Sanctions against Sake 21, LLC, ("Sake 21") filed by Capital One, N.A. ("Capital One"). Related [+]. Sake 21 and Capital One have agreed upon a compromise and, on September 15, 2017, the District Court issued an order dismissing the action as to the claims between these parties. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Discovery Sanctions is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/18/2017.(cg)
Related: [-] c. Doc. 76ference: All Cases
94 94 respm Supplemental Memorandum Mon 09/18 3:56 PM
Supplemental Memorandum filed by Capital One, N.A. in Opposition of83 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Related [+](Lutkewitte, Conor) Modified text on 9/18/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: All Cases
93 93 motion Expedite Mon 09/18 3:56 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite92 Motion to Remand by Kanetha Arun Chau. Related [+](Wallace, Phillip) Modified text on 9/18/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
Att: 1 Proposed Order
92 92 motion Remand to Bankruptcy Court Mon 09/18 3:53 PM
MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Kanetha Arun Chau. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/4/2017. Related [+](Wallace, Phillip)
Related: [-] ference: 16-14733
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Affidavit Kanetha Chau,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
91 91 motion Continue Mon 09/18 1:31 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Trial by Capital One, N.A. Related [+](Lutkewitte, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2017 (clc)
Related: [-] ference: All Cases
Att: 1 Proposed Order