Hanjin Shipping Co., Ltd.
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | John K Sherwood |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-27041 |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 1:04 PM EDT |
Attorney
Thomas A. Labuda, Jr.
Sidley Austin LLP One South Dearborn
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Matthew E Linder
Sidley Austin LLP One South Dearborn
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AT&T Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ATC Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Americo Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anthony Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Apex Maritime Co, Inc.
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ashley Furniture Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AvalonBay Communities, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNSF Railway Company
2650 Lou Menk Rive
Fort Worth, TX 76131 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beacon Intermodal Leasing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carolina Ocean Lines
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carrix Entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ceres Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Long Beach
333 W Ocean Blvd
Long Beach, CA 90802 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Container Leasing International, LLC d/b/a SeaCube Containers LLC
340 Madison Avenue Attn: Tim Walsh and Darren Azman
New York, NY 10173 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Continental Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Domek Logistic, LLC
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dorel Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dynamic Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
East Coast Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eastman Chemical Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eckenberg Farms Inc
8171 E Del Barquero Drive
Scottsdale, AZ 85258 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elite Logistics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Joel R Glucksman Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.
Scarinci & Hollenbeck, LLC 1100 Valley Brook Ave. P.O. Box 790
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Emerson Electric Co.
Scarinci & Hollenbeck, LLC 1100 Valley Brook Ave. P.O. Box 790
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
First Commercial Bank, Ltd., New York Branch
Att: Nancy Isaacson, Esq. Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP 75 Livingston Avenue Suite 301
Roseland, NJ 07068 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc.
251 Monroe Avenue
Kenilworth, NJ 07033 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Florens Container Services (USA) Limited, Dong Fang International Asset Management Limited, and Dong Fang International Asset Management (Singapore) Private Limited
340 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10173 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Forever 21, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GD Trans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Georgia Ports Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Glencore
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Globerunners, Inc.
Scarinci & Hollenbeck, LLC 1100 Valley Brook Ave. P.O. Box 790
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gold Container Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grand Capital International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HP Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Husky Terminal and Stevedoring, Inc.
506 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 200
Santa Monica, CA 90401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intermodal Association of North America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intermodal Cartage Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Longshore and Warehouse Union
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Longshoremen's Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Transportation Service, Inc
506 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 200
Santa Monica, CA 90401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Konica Minolta Business Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kubota Manufacturing Corporation of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kuehne + Nagel Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America, Inc.
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lanyard LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lifetime Brands, Inc.
1201 North Orange Street Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MB Financial Bank, N.A.
6111 N. River Road
Rosemont, IL 60018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MIQ Global, LLC
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Massachusetts Port Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
McAllister Towing & Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mega International Commercial Banking Co., Ltd., Silicon Valley Branch, and Mega International Commercial Banking Co., Ltd., Chicago Branch
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mega International Commercial Banking Co., Ltd., Silicon Valley Branch; Mega International Commercial Banking Co., Ltd., Chicago Branch; Hua Nan Commercial Bank Ltd., Los Angeles Branch; and CTBC Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation
One Speedsell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Moran Towing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NGL Transportation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYK Ports LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYSA-ILA Container
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYSA-ILA Fringe Benefits Escrow Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYSA-ILA Pension Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Connect Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York Shipping Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
5150 Columbine Street Attn: Peter Kooi
Denver, CO 80216 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Norfolk Southern Railway Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
North West Container Systems
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northwest Seaport Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nothwest Seaport Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
O.E.C. Shipping Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Air Freight
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Freight
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Freight (Portland)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Freight (Seattle)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Freight Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Freight Worldwide
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OEC Shipping
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OceanConnect Marine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orient Express Consolidators
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orient Express Container
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Overseas Express Consolidators
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ports America Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rayonier Performance Fibers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
S A Florida International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Savino Del Bene USA, Inc.
34 Englehard Avenue
Avenel, NJ 07001 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schenker Ocean Ltd.
Scarinci & Hollenbeck, LLC 1100 Valley Brook Ave. P.O. Box 790
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schindler Elevator Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seaco Global Ltd.
340 Madison Avenue Attn: Tim Walsh and Darren Azman
New York, NY 10173 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seacube Container Leasing
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Skyocean, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Soulstar Creations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Carolina Ports Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tal International Container Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Technicolor-Connected Home USA LLC
Trenk, DiPasquale, Della Fera & Sodono 347 Mt. Pleasant Avenue, Suite 300
West Orange, NJ 07052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Textainer Equipment Management (U.S.)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Textainer Equipment Management (U.S.) Limited
340 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10173 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Carrier-ILA Container Freight Station Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Carrier-ILA Container Royalty Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Carrier-ILA Container Royalty Fund No. 5
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Container Royalty Central Collection Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Managementj-ILA Managed Health Care Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Total Terminals International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Touax Container Leasing PTE Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toyo Tire Holdings of Americas Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trac Intermodal, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Triton Container International Incorporated of North America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Triton Container International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Attn: Jeffrey T. Testa, Esq. Four Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vehicle Services Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Warn Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent for senior lenders to Total Terminals International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
World Fuel Services, Inc
Gregory & Reed, LLC 2 Sylvan Way Suite 303 West
PARSIPPANY, NJ 07054 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WorldBridge Logistics Inc.
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yamaha Corporation of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yusen Logistics (America), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yusen Terminals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Foreign Representative
Hanjin Shipping Co.., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Foreign Representative
Hanjin Shipping Co., Ltd. 07327
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
APM Terminals Pacific LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bissell Homecare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Canadian National Railway Company
65 Livingston Avenue
Roseland, NJ 07068 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ContainerPort Group
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Epson America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
FedEx Trade Networks, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HSN, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hayward Industries, Inc.
4 Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hellmann Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
3250 Mary Street Suite 405 Suite 405
Miami, FL 33133 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Integrated Marine Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jachs NY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jefferies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jin Han Kim
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Maher Terminals LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
North Carolina State Ports Authority
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pro Construction Trades, Inc. d/b/a Premier Facility Services
80 Route 4 East. Suite 380
Paramus, NJ 07652 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Samsung Electronics
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sumitomo Electric Wiring Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tai-Soo Suk
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Terminal Investment Limited, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Kroger Co.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
702 S.W. Eighth Street
Bentonville, AR 72716 |
Represented By
|
Loss Mitigation
Loan Care Servicing
3637 Sentara Way #303
Virginia Beach, VA 23452 |
|
Non Compliance
James R. Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Non Compliance
Andre Mazzola Mardon
|
Represented By
|
1. | Hanjin Shipping Co. Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy in the U.S. (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 09/12/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 06/04 4:05 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (dmc) |