Gomez v. Bang & Olufesn America, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan A Lenard |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23801 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2017 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andres Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER GRANTING19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DISMISSING case without prejudice; and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING Case. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/2/2017. (jts) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.(Flick, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. (Flick, Charles) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Plaintiff's RESPONSE to19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andres Gomez. (Dinin, Scott) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Count II and Motion for Dismissal of Count II by Andres Gomez (Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2016(Flick, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 11/02 11:12 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendant has had fifty-one (51) days since being served to investigate the Plaintiff's allegations and craft a response. Neither party claims this matter is particularly complex. Instead, defense counsel requests an additional extension of time, essentially stating they are too busy with pending litigation in other courts to file a timely response in this case. (D.E.17 .) The Court is also busy and has an obligation to efficiently manage its docket to avoid congestion and prejudice to other litigants. Accordingly, the Court will reluctantly give the Defendant until November 7, 2016 at noon to file a responsive pleading. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/2/2016. (jts) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc..(Flick, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 11/01 12:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING15 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. After previously seeking and receiving an extension of time, the Defendant requests an additional continuance of Rule 12's response deadline because "Defendant requires additional time to investigate the matters alleged in the Complaint..." (D.E.15 .) The Defendant has not demonstrated good cause as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1); and therefore, its Motion is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/1/2016. (jts) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. (Flick, Charles) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/21 10:42 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING10 Steven H. Gistenson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and GRANTING11 Jennifer A. Warner's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Steven H. Gistenson and Jennifer A. Warner may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendant Bang & Olufsen America, Inc. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Steven H. Gistenson at sgistenson@dykema.com and Jennifer A. Warner at jwarner@dykema.com. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/21/2016. (jts) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc. (Libman, Shawn) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. Attorney Shawn Y. Libman added to party Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.(pty:dft). (Libman, Shawn) |
|
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jennifer A. Warner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9184460 by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2016(Flick, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven H. Gistenson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9184419 by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2016(Flick, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 by Andres Gomez (Dinin, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 10/04 1:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before November 2, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/4/2016. (jts) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Bang & Olufsen America, Inc.. (Flick, Charles) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Philip Flick on behalf of Bang & Olufesn America, Inc.. Attorney Charles Philip Flick added to party Bang & Olufesn America, Inc.(pty:dft). (Flick, Charles) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plasencia, Cathleen) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andres Gomez. Bang & Olufesn America, Inc. served on 9/12/2016, answer due 10/3/2016. (Dinin, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Bang & Olufesn America, Inc. (lrz1) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cathleen M. Plasencia on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plasencia, Cathleen) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (fbn) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 09/02 4:02 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (lrz1) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Bang & Olufesn America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9060731, filed by Andres Gomez.(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |