Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:14-bk-34974

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeff Bohm
Case #: 4:16-ap-03197
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2016
Terminated:May 18, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rayford ER Management Co, LLC d/b/a Premier Emergency Room & Imaging
25440 I-45 S, Suite 300
Spring, TX 77386
Represented By
Rayford ER Management Co, LLC d/b/a Premier Emergency Room & Imaging
contact info
Defendant
Rafael De La Flor-Weiss
31 N. Heritage Hill Circle
The Woodlands, TX 77381
Represented By
Rafael De La Flor-Weiss
contact info
Defendant
Nellie Kay
18955 N. Memorial Drive, Suite 300
Humble, TX 77338
Represented By
Nellie Kay
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Le
6225 FM 2920 Road, Suite 203
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
Kenneth Le
contact info
Defendant
Ravinder Agusala
11111 Jones Road, Suite 1
Houston, TX 77070
Represented By
Ravinder Agusala
contact info
Defendant
Pratap Agusala
103 Quintana Court
Montgomery, TX 77316
Represented By
Pratap Agusala
contact info
Defendant
Roy Moparty
18 Meadowridge Place
Spring, TX 77381
Represented By
Roy Moparty
contact info
Defendant
Dayakar Moparty
6225 FM 2920 Road, Suite 150
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
Dayakar Moparty
contact info
Defendant
Sushma Gorrela
6225 FM 2920 Road, Suite 100
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
Sushma Gorrela
contact info
Defendant
Redoak Hospital LLC
17400 Red Oak Drive
Houston, TX 77090
Represented By
Redoak Hospital LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spring Klein Surgical Hospital LLC
20635 Kuykendahl Road
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
Spring Klein Surgical Hospital LLC
contact info
Defendant
ER DOC 24/7 PLLC
31 N. Heritage Hill
The Woodlands, TX 77381
Represented By
ER DOC 24/7 PLLC
contact info
Defendant
2920 ER LLC, d/b/a Trinity Healthcare Network
18 Meadowridge Place
The Woodlands, TX 77381
Represented By
2920 ER LLC, d/b/a Trinity Healthcare Network
contact info
Defendant
Samir Kreit
24044 Hwy 59 North
Kingwood, TX 77339
Represented By
Samir Kreit
contact info
Defendant
Zelman Leon Joseph
15910 FM 529, Apt. 1110
Houston, TX 77095
Represented By
Zelman Leon Joseph
contact info
Defendant
Don Vickers
1017 South Travis Avenue
Cleveland, TX 77327
Represented By
Don Vickers
contact info
Defendant
Fadi George Ghanem
1111 Medical Plaza Drive, Suite 230
The Woodlands, TX 77380
Represented By
Fadi George Ghanem
contact info
Defendant
Khanh Ngoc Le
26103 I-45 N, Suite 100
The Woodlands, TX 77380
Represented By
Khanh Ngoc Le
contact info
Defendant
Ravi Kumar Moparty
25410 I-45N
The Woodlands, TX 77386
Represented By
Ravi Kumar Moparty
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher L Quinn, trustee of the CI Litigation Trust
1221 McKinney Street Suite 2850
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Matthew Scott Okin
Okin & Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Sunday, May 21, 2017
79 79 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/21 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 35. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 78 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Thursday, May 18, 2017
78 78 order Dismissing Adversary Case Thu 05/18 6:19 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice Case Related [+]. Signed on 5/18/2017. (AmyManley)
Related: [-] uments:71 &77
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Thu 05/18 1:42 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:00 AM. Appearances: D.L. Curry & L.R. Walton, Jr. (by tel.). Related [+]. Trial is canceled. Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding was filed at doc.77 . Motion Granted. Order Signed. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this adversary proceeding. (AmyManley)
Related: [-] uments:71 Trial: First Amended Complaint
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/18 6:23 PM
Adversary Case 4:16-ap-3197 Closed. (AmyManley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
court Certificate of Notice Wed 05/17 6:07 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted D.L. Curry, Jr. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing on Related [+] is scheduled for 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 600 (JB). (vatt)
Related: [-] 77 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
77 77 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/16 4:51 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Christopher L Quinn (Curry, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Revised Tolling Agreement WW RevisionS
Att: 2 Proposed Order Dismissing w Prejudice