California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:16-cv-06700
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1441 - Notice of Removal - SEC Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2016
Terminated:Sep 24, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 05, 2017 1:24 AM PST
Defendant
Robert Rosen
Defendant
Piper Jaffaray and Co
Defendant
Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner and Smith Incorporated
Defendant
MLV and Co LLC
Defendant
Does
Defendant
John C. Thomas Jr.
Defendant
Patrick Soon-Shiong
Defendant
Barry J. Simon
Defendant
Michael D. Blaszyk
Defendant
John T. Potts, Jr.
Defendant
Nantkwest, Inc.
Defendant
MP 13 Ventures LLC
Represented By
Jordan David Eth
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Philip T Besirof
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Kusserow
Defendant
Henry Ji
Defendant
Jefferies LLC
Defendant
Steve Gorlin
Defendant
Richard Gomberg
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Defendant
Cambridge Equities LP
Represented By
Jordan David Eth
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Philip T Besirof
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Frye
Represented By
James I Jaconette
Robbins Geller Rudman And Dowd LLP
contact info
Francis A Bottini, Jr
Bottini And Bottini Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/24 11:41 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CLOSING CONSOLIDATED CASES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court now ORDERS the Clerk of Court to close CV 16, 3438, CV 16- 6697, CV 16-6700 CV 16-6703 and CV 16-6705 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
13 13 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 04/03 10:45 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
12 12 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 11/10 1:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Effective November 17, 2016, Judge Fitzgerald will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 5A on the 5th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 5A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
11 11 order Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 10/11 10:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING Nantkwest Defendants MOTION to Consolidate Related Cases by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that the following cases are consolidated: Sudunagunta v. NantKwest, Inc. et al, Case No. 2:16-cv-01947-MWF-JEM (consolidated action); Wagner v. NantKwest, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:16-cv-06703-MWF-JEM; Hare v. NantKwest, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:16-cv-06697-MWF-JEM; Wiencek v. NantKwest, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:16-cv-06705-MWF-JEM; Frye v. NantKwest, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:16-cv-06700-MWF-JEM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
10 10 order Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34) Tue 09/13 9:49 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-01947 MWF (JEMx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-06700 MWF(JEMx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (esa)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 09/12 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC, (Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2016
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 09/09 1:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC, (Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Wed 09/07 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mary K Blasy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 09/07 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 09/07 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 09/06 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/06 4:53 PM
Cambridge Equities, LP and MP 13 Ventures, LLCs Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons (Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 7.1 and C.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 7.1-1) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC, (Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 09/06 4:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC. (Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/06 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number BC621665 Receipt No: 0973-18500515 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, MP 13 Ventures LLC. (Attorney Philip T Besirof added to party Cambridge Equities LP(pty:dft), Attorney Philip T Besirof added to party MP 13 Ventures LLC(pty:dft))(Besirof, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 09/07 9:49 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Cambridge Equities LP, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Does 1-25, inclusive, Richard Gomberg, Steve Gorlin, Jefferies LLC, Henry Ji, Richard Kusserow, MLV and Co LLC, MP 13 Ventures LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner and Smith Incorporated, Nantkwest, Inc., Piper Jaffaray and Co, John T. Potts, Jr., Robert Rosen, Barry J. Simon, Patrick Soon-Shiong, John C. Thomas Jr.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Frye. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/25/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 1] (et)
Related: [-]