Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:16-cv-02098
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2016
Terminated:Jun 15, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Mar 05, 2017 1:27 AM PST
Defendant
Renee Baker
Ely State Prison PO Box 1989
Ely, NV 89301
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Harold Bryne
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Melina Castro
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Curtis Kerner
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Tasheena Sandoval
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Donald Southworth
Represented By
Jared M Frost
Nevada Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrell Conners
Ely State Prison PO Box 1989
Ely, NV 89301


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 15, 2017
10 10 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/15 10:33 AM
ORDER. Based on9 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that THIS CASE IS DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The5 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
9 9 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/14 10:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Defendants Renee Baker, Harold Bryne, Melina Castro, Curtis Kerner, Tasheena Sandoval, Donald Southworth. (Beavers, Wade)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/30 12:07 PM
RESPONSE to5 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Renee Baker, Harold Bryne, Melina Castro, Curtis Kerner, Tasheena Sandoval, Donald Southworth. Replies due by 10/17/2016.(Frost, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, September 22, 2016
7 7 misc Status Report in Removal Case Thu 09/22 4:24 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Renee Baker, Harold Bryne, Melina Castro, Curtis Kerner, Tasheena Sandoval, Donald Southworth. (Frost, Jared)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Klingele Minute Order - FORM Thu 09/22 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland . Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
5 5 motion Summary Judgment Thu 09/22 11:43 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Darrell Conners. Responses due by 10/15/2016. (ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 09/20 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Service of Minutes of the Court by Renee Baker, Harold Bryne, Melina Castro, Curtis Kerner, Tasheena Sandoval, Donald Southworth re2 Minute Order re Removal,.(Frost, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 09/20 11:50 AM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Renee Baker, Harold Bryne, Melina Castro, Curtis Kerner, Tasheena Sandoval, Donald Southworth. (Frost, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
2 2 minord Minute Order re Removal - FORM Tue 09/06 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 9/6/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/24/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Removal Tue 09/06 1:07 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 7th Judicial District Court, Case Number CF-1606005, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4269891), filed by Tasheena Sandoval, Melina Castro, Harold Bryne, Donald Southworth, Renee Baker, Curtis Kerner. Proof of service due by 10/11/2016.(Frost, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/06 3:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
Related: [-]