Original Case: 2:15-cv-00157

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-03355
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2016
Terminated:Aug 01, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
TIME WARNER CABLE
Represented By
Anthony E. Giardino
KABAT CHAPMAN & OZMER, LLP
contact info
Abigail Stecker Romero
KABAT CHAPMAN & OZMER, LLP
contact info
Joseph W. Ozmer II
KABAT CHAPMAN & OZMER, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CORY GROSHEK
Represented By
Heath Paul Straka
GINGRAS, CATES & LUEBKE, S.C.
contact info
Robert J. Gingras
GINGRAS, CATES & LUEBKE, S.C.
contact info
Michael J. Modl
AXLEY BRYNELSON LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 01 2017
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Bauer. AFFIRMED. William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge; Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge and Jon E. DeGuilio, District Court Judge. [6858061-1] [6858061] [16-3355, 16-3711]

Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 3:37 AM CDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 09/20/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/17/2016 for Cory Groshek. [1] [6780418] 16-3355 (VG)
Related: [-]