Grace et al v. Alaska Air Group, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05165 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 06, 2017 1:30 AM PST |
Defendant
Alaska Airlines, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Virgin America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alaska Air Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Len Marazzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael C. Malaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Ann Meeuwsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. West Oehmig, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Prosterman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah M. Pulfer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana L. Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A. Rosenthal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Rubinsohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sondra K. Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia N. Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
June Stansbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clyde D. Stensrud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Taleff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Talewsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annette M. Tippetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Lynn Ultican
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Michael Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela S. Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Fjord
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Dean Bradt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Bray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose M. Brito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Marie Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D. Conway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Crandall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemary D'Augusta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda K. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Farrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Faust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine R. Arcell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Freeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Fry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Garavanian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Garavanian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee M. Gentry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Grace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valarie Ann Jolly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail S. Kosach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lovell
|
Represented By
|
1. | Alaska Air agrees to settle lawsuit filed on behalf of 42 fliers and travel agents opposing Virgin America merger (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/08/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
87 | 87
misc
Transcript Order
Tue 12/13 10:00 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/07/2016 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Alaska Air Group, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (O'Rourke, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/13/2016) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
86 | 86
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 12/09 9:19 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 85 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
85 | 85
4
pgs
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 12/08 4:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Daniel Grace.(Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 12/8/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
84 | 84
misc
Transcript Order
Thu 12/08 1:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 7, 2016 before Hon. William Alsup by Alaska Air Group, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (O'Rourke, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/8/2016) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
83 | 83
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Wed 12/07 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Interim Pretrial Conference not held on 12/7/2016. Parties settled the case; and shall file a dismissal order by noon Friday.Total Time in Court 5 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney Joseph Alioto; Theresa Moore; Jaime Miller; Lawrence Papale; Gil Messina. Defendant Attorney Richard Parker; William Stallings; Benjamin Bradshaw; Kenneth O'Rourke. Attachment minute order.(dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2016) |
|
82 | 82
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 12/07 12:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 12/7/2016. Case settled. Terms placed on the record are confidential. (Digital FTR Recording: 12:37-12:45 -Digital Recording Under Seal. Counsel in attendance at the settlement conference my obtain a copy of the recording/transcript without a court order.) Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher A. Nedeau, Noah J. Moss, Thomas Paul Pier, Lawrence Genaro Papale, Joseph M. Alioto, Theresa D. Moore, Gil D. Messina and Jaime Miller. Defendant Attorney: Benjamin G. Bradshaw, Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Richard G. Parker, William H. Stallings. Clients: Jeremy Ross, Kyle B. Levine, John Varley, Jose M. Brito, Jan Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Carolyn Fjord, Jaime Fjord, Len Marazzo and Lisa McCarthy. This is a text only Minute Entry. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2016) Modified on 12/7/2016 (lsS, COURT STAFF) |
|
81 | 81
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/07 10:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM by Hon. William Alsup granting 78 Motion to bring equipment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 12/07 9:35 AM
Electronic filing error. Re:80 Letter filed by Virgin America Inc.,77 Letter, filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
80 | 80
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 12/06 7:39 PM
Letter from William H. Stallings To The Honorable William Alsup, dated December 6, 2016 . (Stallings, William) (Filed on 12/6/2016) |
|
79 | 79
order
Order
Tue 12/06 4:42 PM
ORDER. Given the DOJ's settlement with the defendants, and in aid of a productive mediation in the morning, the court asks the plaintiffs to communicate any revised demand (or a statement that there is no revised demand) to the defendants and the court as soon as is reasonable, preferably tonight by 7 p.m., and in any event by tomorrow morning at 7 a.m. The parties' communication to the court may be by email to lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/6/2016) |
|
78 | 78
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/06 2:05 PM
MOTION For An Administrative Miscellaneous Request for Entry of Equipment Into Courtroom filed by Alaska Air Group, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 12/20/2016.(O'Rourke, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/6/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
77 | 77
misc
Letter
Tue 12/06 11:14 AM
Letter from Benjamin G. Bradshaw to The Honorable William Alsup In Response to the November 28, 2016 Notice Re Closing And Request For Response .(Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/6/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment C, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment D | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 12/06 12:50 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Bench Trial set for 12/12/2016 12/13/2016 12/14/2016 12/15/2016 12/16/2016 12/19/2016 12/20/2016 12/21/2016 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016) |