California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles Novack
Case #: 4:16-bk-42521
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Oct 11, 2016
Terminated:Oct 08, 2019

Debtor
FloraTech Landscape Management, Inc.
25670 Nickel Pl
Hayward, CA 94545-3222
Represented By
Chris D. Kuhner
Kornfield, Nyberg, Bendes And Kuhner
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marlene G. Weinstein
1511 Sycamore Ave. #M-259
Hercules, CA 94547
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 09/08/2016 12:01 PM PDT
Thursday, September 08, 2016
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-42521 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 26697100, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/11/2016 at 10:00 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by FloraTech Landscape Management, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 09/22/2016. (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 5000 Filed by Debtor FloraTech Landscape Management, Inc. (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]