Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 6:16-cv-00056
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2016
Terminated:May 22, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 30, 2023
36 36 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/30 10:14 AM
ORDER denying35 Motion Relief from Judgment. Petitioners Rule 60(b) motion is, in essence, a successive petition, so this Court lacks authority to consider it because Petitioner has not obtained authorization from the Fifth Circuit. Alternatively, and to the extent that Petitioners motion could be properly considered under Rule 60(b), the Court finds that it must be denied because Petitioner did not bring his claims within a reasonable time and he failed to demonstrate extraordinary circumstances that would justify relief. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/30/2023) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 01/30 10:15 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 36. mailed to Petitioner. Mon Jan 30 10:15:08 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/24 12:03 PM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by Johnny Flores Navarro with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ltrs & env
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
34 34 appeal USCA Judgment/Mandate Wed 02/20 11:14 AM
ORDER of USCA as to30 Notice of Appeal filed by Johnny Flores Navarro. Navarro has not made the required showing. Accordingly, his motion for a COA is Denied. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA clk ltr
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
appeal Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted Tue 07/10 8:10 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-10740 Related [+]: Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 1 Electronic state court record (Doc8 ). PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (dsr)
Related: [-] lated to30 appeal
Thursday, June 28, 2018
33 33 appeal USCA Letter Thu 06/28 8:45 AM
Received copy of letter from USCA re Appellant must apply for a certificate of appealability. (dss)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 06/28 11:08 AM
USCA Case Number 18-10740 in USCA Fifth Circuit for30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Johnny Flores Navarro. (dss)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/22 9:47 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/22/2018) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 06/22 9:50 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 32. mailed to Navarro Fri Jun 22 09:50:14 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
misc Order Receipt Wed 06/20 10:01 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. mailed NEF of Appeal along with a Transcript Order Form. Wed Jun 20 10:01:43 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
31 31 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/19 5:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with certificate of trust account re30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Johnny Flores Navarro. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 inmate trust account
30 30 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 06/19 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Order,29 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 6/19/2018, by Johnny Flores Navarro. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Navarro cov ltr,
Att: 2 USCA ltr
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
29 29 order Judgment Tue 05/22 9:45 AM
JUDGMENT re:8 Administrative Record. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and -numbered cause is dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/22/2018) (dss)
Related: [-]
28 28 6 pgs order Order Tue 05/22 9:42 AM
ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED and dismissed with prejudice. All relief not expressly granted is denied and any pending motions are denied. Any request for certificate of appealability is denied. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/22/2018) (dss)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/22 9:45 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28, 29. Tue May 22 09:45:48 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
27 27 misc Status Request Mon 05/14 3:13 PM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro. Deputy Clerk mailed courtesy copy of public docket sheet to Navarro. (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/14 3:14 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailing label only. Mon May 14 15:14:21 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
26 26 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Mon 03/12 3:43 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.24 Notice of Change of Address,25 Mail returned, received back from USPS as Needed TDCJ # on last mailed document. New address: Johnny Flores Navarro #1931583, TDCJ Gurney Unit, 1385 FM 3328, Palestine, TX 75803. The current document has been re-mailed. (dss)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 03/12 3:45 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mon Mar 12 15:45:30 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
25 25 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Mon 02/26 3:34 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.22 Status Request received back from USPS as RTS/Not Here/Unable to Forward. Address updated from last filed document24 . New address: TDCJ Gurney Unit, 1385 FM 3328, Palestine, Texas 75803. The current document has been re-mailed. (dss)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 02/26 3:34 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mon Feb 26 15:34:50 CST 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Johnny Flores Navarro. New address: Prisoner #1931583, Gurney Unit, 1385 FM 3328, Palestine, TX 75803. Mailed NEF to Navarro as proof of address update, per request. (dss)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2018
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/02 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Johnny Flores Navarro. New address: Limestone County Detention Center, 910 N. Tyus Rd., Groesback, Texas 76642. (dss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
22 22 misc Status Request Thu 01/25 3:21 PM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro regarding his change of request notice with Deputy Clerk Response. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response ltr
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/16 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Johnny Flores Navarro. New address: Tom Green County Jail, 122 West Harris Avenue. San Angelo, Texas 76903. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 12/07 9:29 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Charles D. Arnone is substituted for Melissa Hargis as lead counsel for Respondent. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/7/2017) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 12/07 9:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20. mailed to Petitioner. Thu Dec 7 09:31:44 CST 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 12/05 10:58 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Charles Arnone added attorney Charles Arnone,Charles Arnone for Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. Motion filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Charles Arnone added to party Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID(pty:res) (Arnone, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 06, 2017
18 18 misc Status Request Mon 11/06 4:26 PM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro with Deputy Clerk Response. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response
Friday, July 21, 2017
17 17 misc Status Request Fri 07/21 9:21 AM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro with Deputy Clerk Response. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response
Friday, May 12, 2017
16 16 misc Status Request Fri 05/12 4:08 PM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro with Deputy Clerk Response. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response
Monday, April 10, 2017
15 15 misc Status Request Mon 04/10 3:04 PM
Status Request by Johnny Flores Navarro. Clerk mailed courtesy copy of public docket sheet to Navarro addressed as set out on the docket sheet. (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/10 3:04 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailing label only. Mon Apr 10 15:04:57 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 03/01 10:31 AM
ORDER denying13 Motion for Leave to Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed on February 27, 2017. To the extent the motion could be construed as a motion to reconsider the Court's prior Order denying Petitioner leave to supplement, is also denied. The time for amending as a matter of course has passed and Petitioner has failed to show that justice requires the Court to consider the proposed supplemental information. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/1/2017) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 03/01 10:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. mailed to Petitioner. Wed Mar 1 10:31:34 CST 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
13 13 motion Leave to File Mon 02/27 3:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended 28:2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnny Flores Navarro with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover ltr & env
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 02/07 2:22 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/7/2017) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 02/07 2:23 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 12. Tue Feb 7 14:23:18 CST 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
11 11 motion Leave to File Fri 02/03 10:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Supplement Writ of Habeas Corpus petition filed by Johnny Flores Navarro with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
10 10 respm Reply Wed 12/07 3:39 PM
REPLY filed by Johnny Flores Navarro re:6 Response to1 Habeas Petition. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover ltr & envelope
Monday, November 21, 2016
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE of receipt of State Court Records on disc re:8 Administrative Record, filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. Disc forwarded to Pro Se staff attorneys in Lubbock via regular U.S. Mail. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
8 8 misc Administrative Record Thu 11/17 11:51 AM
Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Hargis, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Record,
Att: 2 Supp Clerk's Record,
Att: 3 Appellant's Anders Brief 11-6-14,
Att: 4 State's Letter Response (No Brief) 11-13-14,
Att: 5 Pro Se Appellant's Brief 2-23-15,
Att: 6 Pro se Resp to Atty's Mtn to Withdraw,
Att: 7 Appellant's Supp Brief 6-22-15,
Att: 8 Judgment,
Att: 9 Memorandum Opinion,
Att: 10 RR - Vol 1 of 3,
Att: 11 RR - Vol 2 of 3,
Att: 12 RR - Vol 3 of 3,
Att: 13 PD-1211-15 MTN FOR EXT PDR 9-18-15,
Att: 14 PD-1211-15 Ntc of Address Change PDR 11-20-15,
Att: 15 PD-1211-15 ORIGINAL PDR 12-4-15,
Att: 16 PD-1211-15 RETURNED TO COA 3-30-16,
Att: 17 WR-85,306-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 7-20-16,
Att: 18 WR-85,306-01 WRIT RECEIVED 6-27-16
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 11/17 11:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Hargis, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Response to Habeas Petition Thu 11/17 11:45 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID.Attorney Melissa L Hargis added to party Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID(pty:res) (Hargis, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
5 5 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/21 1:20 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID re4 Order to Show Cause,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (dsr)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/21 11:43 AM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/21/2016) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 09/21 11:43 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 4. mailed to Petitioner. Wed Sep 21 11:43:50 CDT 2016 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2016
3 3 qcref Cummings (West Texas) Fri 09/09 4:40 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dss)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 09/09 4:39 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (dss)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 09/09 4:38 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnny Flores Navarro. (Filing fee not paid.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in support,
Att: 2 cover letter and envelope
misc Order Receipt Fri 09/09 4:41 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Fri Sep 9 16:41:33 CDT 2016 (crt)
Related: [-]