Abbud v. El Paso County, TX
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Philip R Martinez |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Petitioner
Jose Julian Abbud
|
|
Respondent
El Paso County, TX
|
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
![]() Letter of Correspondence regarding appeals that were previously denied from Jose Julian Abbud. (dt) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
54 | 54
![]() Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jose Julian Abbud. (mm1) |