Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:16-cv-13292
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2016
Terminated:Jun 29, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2017 5:25 AM EDT
Amicus
482Forward
17000 W. 10 Mile Rd Southfield
Southfield, MI 48075
Represented By
Mark C. Brewer
Goodman Acker
contact info
Amicus
American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Marshall J. Widick
Sachs Waldman
contact info
Amicus
International Literacy Association
Represented By
Dennis J. Clark
contact info
Amicus
Kappa Delta Pi
Represented By
Dennis J. Clark
contact info
Amicus
Michigan Education Law and Policy Professors
Represented By
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Amicus
National Association for Multicultural Education
Represented By
Dennis J. Clark
contact info
Amicus
The City of Detroit
Represented By
Melvin J. Hollowell, Jr.
Melvin J. Hollowell, Jr., Attorney At Law
contact info
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Eli Savit
City Of Detroit Mayor'S Office
contact info
Amicus
The Skillman Foundation
Represented By
Samuel McCargo
Lewis & Munday
contact info
Defendant
David B. Behen
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John C. Austin
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Natasha Baker
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Fecteau
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Pamela Pugh
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Lupe Ramos-Montigny
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Richard D. Snyder
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen N. Straus
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Casandra E. Ulbrich
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Eileen Weiser
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Brian J. Whiston
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Richard Zeile
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary B.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessie K.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul M.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher R.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Isaias R.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaime R.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Esmeralda V.
Represented By
Bruce A. Miller
Miller Cohen, PLC
contact info
Joshua E. Anderson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alisa l. Hartz
Public Counsel
contact info
Jennifer M. Wheeler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Cary S. McGehee
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Public Counsel
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carter Glasgow Phillips
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Edmonde Haddad
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Michael C. Kelley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David B. Behan
Terminated: 10/03/2016
Represented By
Timothy J. Haynes
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan S. Ludwig
Mi Dept Of Attorney General
contact info
Joshua S. Smith
Mi Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2018
[DOCKETING ERROR - INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT] OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 60 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
GPO Jul 27 2018
OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 60 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, re 116 Notice of Correction. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Docket last updated: 11/15/2019 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
126 126 appeal Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment Tue 3:03 PM
ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re114 Notice of Appeal filed by Jessie K., Gary B., Esmeralda V., Jaime R., Isaias R., Paul M., Christopher R.,118 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jessie K., Gary B., Esmeralda V., Jaime R., Isaias R., Paul M., Christopher R. [Appeal Case Number 18-1855 (SKra)
Related: [-]