Virginia Citizens Defense League et al v. Couric et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Gibney, Jr |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00757 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2017 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Atlas Films LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katie Couric
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Soechtig
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Studio 3 Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel L. Hawes, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Citizens Defense League
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Webb
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge dismisses Katie Couric $12M gun documentary lawsuit (nydailynews.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/01/2017 | |
2. | Katie Couric files for dismissal of gun group's defamation lawsuit over her documentary (foxnews.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/01/2016 | |
3. | Katie Couric Faces $12M Defamation Lawsuit for "Deceptively Edited" Documentary (fortune.com) |
Submitted Wed 09/14/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 01/04 11:34 AM
USCA Mandate re44 Notice of Appeal: The judgment of this court, entered 12/13/2018, takes effect today.This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lgar, ) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 12/14 10:38 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to44 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Webb, Daniel L. Hawes, Esq., Virginia Citizens Defense League: In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed.This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (lgar, ) |
|
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Opinion
Fri 12/14 10:37 AM
Opinion of USCA (Copy) re44 Notice of Appeal: Affirmed by published opinion.(lgar, ) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 06/30 9:27 AM
USCA Case Number 17-1783 Case Manager CPoulsen for44 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Webb, Daniel L. Hawes, Esq., Virginia Citizens Defense League. (lgar, ) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
Thu 06/29 1:13 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re44 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lgar, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 06/28 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to43 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by Daniel L. Hawes, Esq, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Patricia Webb. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-5593694. (Watkins, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/31 4:00 PM
FINAL ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the defendants' motions to dismiss.26 ,28 . For the reasons stated in the accompanying Opinion, the Court GRANTS the motions and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 5/31/2017. (tjoh, ) |
|
42 | 42
11
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Wed 05/31 3:59 PM
OPINION. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 05/31/2017. (tjoh, ) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Transcript
Thu 02/02 4:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 02/01/2017, before Judge Hon. John A. Gibney, Jr., Court Reporter Gil Halasz, Telephone number 804 916-2248. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2017.(halasz, gil) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 02/01 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2017 re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Katie Couric, Atlas Films LLC,28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Studio 3 Partners, LLC.; arguments heard; matter taken under advisement (Court Reporter G. Halasz, OCR.)(wtuc) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/13 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set with motions hearing for 2/1/2017 at 01:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 1/13/17. (wtuc) (wtuc, ) |
|
Att: 1 (1/13/2017) Electronic Device Authorization Form | ||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/06 1:35 PM
Set as to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6): Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2017 at 01:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (wtuc) |
||
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 12/23 3:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Atlas Films LLC, Katie Couric. (Kelley, Matthew) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 12/23 2:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 12/16 6:22 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Virginia Citizens Defense League.(Meier, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Audiotape_ Katie Couric documentary falsely depicts gun supporters as idiots - The Washington Post, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B 20160525 Katie Couric stands by 'Under the Gun' as director apologizes for misleading edit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C 20161104 [Dkt. 366] Jury Verdict as to Liability | ||
34 | 34
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 12/16 6:18 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Virginia Citizens Defense League.(Meier, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Jan. 6, 2006 EDVA Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Dec. 8, 2005 Defs.' Memo iso MTD | ||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/12 1:29 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Atlas Films LLC. (Kelley, Matthew) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/12 12:35 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Thu 12/01 12:13 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. The Court needs additional information to confirm that complete diversity exists betweenthe parties, thus assuring that it has subject matter jurisdiction in this case. Specifically, the Court needs more information about the members of Atlas Films LLC and Studio 3 Partners, LLC (the "LLC Defendants"). The LLC Defendants disclosed a list of members in their financial disclosure statements, but did not include the headquarters of the member-corporations, and did not include the members of the member-LLCs. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the citizenship of each member. The LLC Defendants shall submit this information by December 15, 2016. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 12/01/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 11/29 8:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Stephanie Soechtig by Daniel L. Hawes, Esq, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Patricia Webb(Meier, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - S. Soechtig Dismissal | ||
29 | 29
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 11/29 7:34 PM
Memorandum in Support re28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Studio 3 Partners, LLC.(Curran, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss
Tue 11/29 7:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
27 | 27
34
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 11/29 7:15 PM
Memorandum in Support re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Atlas Films LLC, Katie Couric. (Kelley, Matthew) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 11/29 7:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Atlas Films LLC, Katie Couric.(Kelley, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/29 3:54 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Atlas Films LLC. (Kelley, Matthew) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 11/18 10:00 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Linda Steinman for Studio 3 Partners, LLC. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/17/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 11/18 9:59 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Elizabeth McNamara for Studio 3 Partners, LLC. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/17/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/16 12:23 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Linda Steinman and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick J. Curran, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5253029. by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/16 12:20 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth McNamara and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick J. Curran, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5253019. by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 11/16 9:11 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, and Serve Responsive Pleadings . Defendants have until November 29, 2016, to file and serve responsive pleadings. Plaintiffs have until December 16, 2016, to file and serve briefs in opposition to Defendants' responsive motions, and Defendants have until December 23, 2016, to file and serve rebuttals to Plaintiffs' briefs in opposition. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/16/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 11/15 11:36 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, and Serve Responsive Pleadings by Virginia Citizens Defense League.(Clare, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/15 11:13 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nicholas Gamse for Katie Couric. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/15/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/15 11:12 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nathan Siegel for Atlas Films LLC,Nathan Siegel for Stephanie Soechtig. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/15/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/15 10:43 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Curran, Patrick) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/15 10:41 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Thomas Goodman Hentoff for Katie Couric. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/16/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/15 10:40 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kevin T. Baine for Katie Couric. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/16/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 7:10 PM
First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Gamse and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5249845. by Katie Couric. (Rose, Emily) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 7:09 PM
First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Hentoff and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5249843. by Katie Couric. (Rose, Emily) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 7:07 PM
First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5249839. by Katie Couric. (Rose, Emily) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ann Rose on behalf of Katie Couric (Rose, Emily) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Jolene Gassmann on behalf of Atlas Films LLC, Stephanie Soechtig (Gassmann, Mara) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 2:31 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan Siegel and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew E. Kelley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5249015. by Atlas Films LLC, Stephanie Soechtig.(Kelley, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Application | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Curran, Jr on behalf of Studio 3 Partners, LLC (Curran, Patrick) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kelley on behalf of Atlas Films LLC, Stephanie Soechtig (Kelley, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/12 3:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Virginia Citizens Defense League, Patricia Webb, Daniel L. Hawes, Esq. Katie Couric waiver sent on 9/19/2016, answer due 11/18/2016; Studio 3 Partners, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2016, answer due 11/29/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 10/11 4:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Virginia Citizens Defense League, Patricia Webb, Daniel L. Hawes, Esq. Atlas Films LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2016, answer due 11/28/2016; Stephanie Soechtig waiver sent on 9/29/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. (tjoh, ) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/15 2:46 PM
Summonses Issued as to Atlas Films LLC, Katie Couric, Stephanie Soechtig, Studio 3 Partners, LLC. (Counsel notified to pick up summonses for service by private process).(tjoh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/13 10:39 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Virginia Citizens Defense League. (tjoh, ) |
|
1 | 1
53
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/13 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Atlas Films LLC, Katie Couric, Stephanie Soechtig, Studio 3 Partners, LLC d/b/a Epix ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34683034429.), filed by Virginia Citizens Defense League, Patricia Webb, Daniel L. Hawes, Esq.(tjoh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 09/13 10:41 AM
Remark - Exhibit 1 is filed in brown expandable in the Clerk's Office. (tjoh, ) |