Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 5:16-cv-00211
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Oct 27, 2016 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Alliance for Climate Protection Corp
Defendant
Ceres Inc
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
Climate Action Network
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
Climateworks Foundation
Defendant
Earthjustice Corp
Defendant
Environmental Defense Action Fund Corp
Defendant
Environmental Defense Fund, Inc
Defendant
Environmental Grantmakers Association Corp
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
Fenton Communications Corp
Defendant
Ford Foundation
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Sam Crockett Neel
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Defendant
Friends of Earth International Corp
Defendant
Friends of the Earth (Action) Inc
Defendant
Friends of the Earth US Corp
Defendant
Generation Investment Management LLP
Represented By
Lindsey Beth Cohan
Dechert LLP
contact info
Defendant
Generation Investment Management US LLP
Represented By
Lindsey Beth Cohan
Dechert LLP
contact info
Defendant
Global Call for Climate Action Corp
Defendant
Greenpeace Fund Inc
Defendant
Greenpeace Inc
Defendant
Greenpeace International Corp
Defendant
Howard Pew Freedom Trust
Defendant
J.N. Pew Jr Charitable Trust
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-99
Defendant
Mabel Pew Myrin Trust
Defendant
NRDC Action Fund Corp
Defendant
Natural Resources Defense Council Inc
Defendant
Rockefeller Brothers Fund Inc
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
Sierra Club Corp
Defendant
Sierra Club Foundation Corp
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
The Consultative Group On Biological Diversity Corp
Defendant
The David and Lucile Packard Foundation
Defendant
The Energy Foundation
Defendant
The John D and Catherine T MacArthur Foundation
Defendant
The Pew Charitable Trusts
Represented By
William B Nes
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Pew Memorial Trust
Defendant
The Union of Concerned Scientists Inc
Defendant
The William & Flora Hewlett Foundation
Defendant
Tides Center Corporation
Defendant
Tides Foundation Corporation
Defendant
US Climate Action Network Corp
Represented By
Lawrence M Doss
Mullin Hoard & Brown
contact info
Defendant
World Wide Fund for Nature Trust
Represented By
Jason C Hoggan
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
World Wildlife Fund Inc
Represented By
William B Mateja
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Fernando M Bustos
Bustos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jason C Hoggan
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonid Goldstein
12501 Tech Ridge Blvd #1535
Austin, TX 78753


Docket last updated: 02/22/2017 11:59 PM CST
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
133 133 motion Leave to File Tue 7:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File The First Supplemental Complaint filed by Leonid Goldstein with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Goldstein, Leonid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Amendment The First Supplemental Complaint,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
132 132 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 1:17 PM
ORDER granting129 Defendant Friends of Earth International Corp.'s Unopposed Motion to Join Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support ; granting130 Defendant Global Call for Climate Action's Unopposed Motion to Join Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support; granting131 Defendant Friends of Earth International Corp.'s Corrected Unopposed Motion to Join Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/21/2017) (egp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
131 131 motion Miscellaneous Relief Amend/Correct Fri 5:10 PM
MOTION Join in Motion to Dismiss re39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,129 MOTION Join in Motion to Dismiss re39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,, MOTION to Amend/Correct129 MOTION Join in Motion to Dismiss re39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, () filed by Friends of Earth International Corp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Doss, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
130 130 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 4:48 PM
MOTION Join in Motion to Dismiss re39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Global Call for Climate Action Corp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Lawrence M Doss added to party Global Call for Climate Action Corp(pty:dft) (Doss, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
129 129 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 4:21 PM
MOTION Join in Motion to Dismiss re39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Friends of Earth International Corp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Doss, Lawrence)
Related: [-]