Fraternity Collection, LLC v. FARGNOLI
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Carlton W Reeves |
Referred: | F Keith Ball |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-00664 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 8:20 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
ELISE FARGNOLI
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Fraternity Collection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELISE FARGNOLI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fraternity Collection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
76 | 76
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Thu 10/13 8:17 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice65 Motion to Reopen Case and Enforce Settlement. Copy mailed to Fraternity Collection, LLC, c/o Peter Rafferty, 615 Main St., Columbia, MS 39429. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/13/2016. (JRB) |