GKI Incorporated
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Lynch |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-82168 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
GKI Incorporated
6204 Factory Road
Crystal Lake, IL 60014 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 780 Regent St. Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/14/2016 7:00 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a)
Thu 09/15 7:40 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717, Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated (Brody, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/15 7:42 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-82168 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32824745. Fee Amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A)
Thu 09/15 7:47 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated . (Brody, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A)
Thu 09/15 7:48 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated . (Brody, Steven) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A)
Thu 09/15 7:49 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated . (Brody, Steven) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A)
Thu 09/15 7:50 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated . (Brody, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 09/15 12:07 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/12/2016 at 11:00 AM at Stewart Square, 308 West State Street, Rm. 40, Rockford, Illinois 61101. Last day to object to dischargeability is 12/12/2016 (Krystavel, Kara) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Thu 09/15 1:40 PM
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by Steven J Brody on behalf of GKI Incorporated. (Brody, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Emergency Motion | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 09/17 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 176. Notice Date 09/17/2016. (Admin.) |