Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:13-bk-12769
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Dec 04, 2013
Terminated:Feb 17, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Jul 10, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Laboratory Partners, Inc.
671 Ohio Pike Ste K
Cincinnati, OH 45245-2136
Represented By
Jonathan J. Russo
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Justin K. Houser
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Margot P. Erlich
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Erin R Fay
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Leo T. Crowley
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
BMC Group, Inc.
www.bmcgroup.com Attn: Claims & Noticing Agent 18675 Lake Drive East
Chanhassen, MN 55317
Represented By
Erin R Fay
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Laboratory Partners, Inc., et al.
Represented By
Margaret M. Manning
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Gianfranco Finizio
Otterbourg P.C.
contact info
David M. Posner
Otterbourg P.C.
contact info
Scott L. Hazan
Otterbourg P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, March 14, 2016
859 859 misc Post-Confirmation Report Mon 03/14 2:37 PM
Post-Confirmation Report Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report for the Reporting Period January 1, 2016 to February 11, 2016 Filed by Laboratory Partners, Inc.. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
858 858 misc Post-Confirmation Report Mon 03/14 2:35 PM
Post-Confirmation Report Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report for the Reporting Period October 1, 2015 to December 31, 2015 Filed by Laboratory Partners, Inc.. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
857 857 claims Claims Register Fri 03/11 7:26 PM
Claims Register - Alpha and Numeric . Filed by BMC Group, Inc.. (Myers, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numeric