Lever v. Lyons et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Margo K Brodie |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05130 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 14, 2017 5:00 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Christina Lyons
119 Ward Street
Orange, NJ 07050 |
|
Counter Defendant
Kenric Lever
|
|
Defendant
Lescele Bogle
67 Sawyer Avenue
Eastampton, NJ 08060 |
|
Defendant
Christina Lyons
119 Ward Street
Orange, NJ 07050 |
|
Plaintiff
Kenric Lever
153 St. Marks Ave.
Brooklyn, NY 11238 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
79 | 79
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 06/14 12:39 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to78 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenric Lever. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective unless by that date appellant either pays the fee in full, moves for in forma pauperis status in District Court or, if District Court has denied in forma pauperis status, moves in this Court for in forma pauperis status. If appellant has filed the motion in District Court and the motion is pending, appellant must so advise this Court in writing by the same date. Issued as Mandate: 6/14/2021. USCA# 21-5 (Jones, Vasean) |