EMBURY v. BANK OF AMERICA
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maurice M Paul |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-00211 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2013 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 9:30 AM EST |
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Material Witness
SELDON J CHILDERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER E EMBURY
1317 SW 226TH ST
NEWBERRY, FL 32669 |
Docket last updated: 10/29/2013 12:15 AM EDT |
Friday, October 25, 2013 | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint (No service copies received, fee paid), 3 Civil Filing Fee Received. (kdm) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA (Filing fee $400.), filed by JENNIFER E EMBURY. (No service copies received, fee paid.) (kdm) | |
2 | 2 1 pgs CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) | |
3 | 3 Civil Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1-2096 Fee status updated to paid. (kdm) | |
4 | 4 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: JENNIFER E EMBURY, 1317 SW 226TH ST, NEWBERRY, FL 32669. (kdm) |