California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:96-cr-05012
Case Filed:Jan 19, 1996
Terminated:Dec 31, 2015
Defendant
David Lee Sheridan
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Mar 21 2012
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to David Lee Sheridan (1), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/21/2012. (Marrujo, C)
GPO Mar 21 2012
ORDER STAYING Magistrate's Release Order and SETTING HEARING on Government's Motion to Revoke Order of Release, as to David Lee Sheridan, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2012. (Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2012 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Marrujo, C)
GPO Mar 23 2012
ORDER OF RELEASE as to David Lee Sheridan signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 23, 2012. (Munoz, I)
GPO Jun 14 2012
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT RE REVOCATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE as to David Lee Sheridan signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 13, 2012. (Munoz, I)
GPO Mar 28 2014
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to David Lee Sheridan (1) xx, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/28/2014. (Fahrney, E)
GPO Mar 28 2014
APPEARANCE and COMPLIANCE BOND as to David Lee Sheridan signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/28/2014. (Jessen, A)
GPO Apr 22 2014
STIPULATION and ORDER-GRANTED. Sentencing re Violation Petition currently set for 4/28/2014 has been CONTINUED to 5/19/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 22, 2014. (Munoz, I)
GPO May 14 2014
ORDER to Set Probation Violation Sentencing as to David Lee Sheridan, Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/14/2014. The Sentencing Hearing re Violation of Probation previously set for 5/19/2014 is RESET to 7/21/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. All previous probation conditions of release remain in full force and effect. Defendant is ordered to stay at WestCare Treatment Facility, Fresno, California until released by his probation officer. (Arellano, S.)
GPO Jul 02 2014
DETENTION ORDER as to David Lee Sheridan signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/2/2014. (Timken, A)
GPO Jul 24 2014
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT RE REVOCATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE as to David Lee Sheridan signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 24, 2014. (Munoz, I)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.