Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:13-cr-00019
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2017 2:41 PM EST
Defendant
Jesse C. Litvak (1)
Represented By
Patrick Joseph Smith
Dla Piper Us Llp-Ny
contact info
Masha G. Hansford
Williams & Connolly, Llp - Dc
contact info
Sarah B. Zimmer
Dla Piper Us Llp-Ny
contact info
Andrew M. Zeitlin
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Krystal R. Commons
Williams & Connolly, Llp - Dc
contact info
Adam D. Harber
Williams & Connolly-Dc
contact info
Michael G Chase
Shipman & Goodwin -Constplza-Htfd
contact info
Ross H. Garber
Shipman & Goodwin -Constplza-Htfd
contact info
C. J. Mahoney
Williams & Connolly-Dc
contact info
Katherine A. Trefz
Williams & Connolly-Dc
contact info
John Michael Hillebrecht
Dla Piper Us Llp-Ny
contact info
Elise M. Baumgarten
Williams & Connolly, Llp - Dc
contact info
Eric J. Lubochinski
Shipman & Goodwin - Stmfd
contact info
Courtney G. Saleski
Dla Piper, Llp -PA
contact info
Dane H. Butswinkas
Williams & Connolly-Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David B. Fein
contact info
Eric J. Glover
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Heather L. Cherry
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Jonathan N. Francis
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
William J. Nardini
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Witness
Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By
John B. Hughes
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Kathleen Burdette Shields
U. S. Securities And Exchange Comm. Bos
contact info
Rua M. Kelly
Securities & Exchange Commission - Ma
contact info

GPO Jul 02 2014
RULINGdenying 212 Motion for Directed Verdict as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying 237 Motion for Acquittal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying 237 Motion for New Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2014. (Lewis, D)
GPO Jan 23 2015
RULING re 261 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Sentencing Memorandum and Certain Exhibits in Support as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/22/2015. (Lewis, D)
Docket last updated: 01/04/2017 2:40 PM EST
Friday, January 25, 2013
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT returned before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Bench Warrant to issue, returned before grand jury number N-12-3 B-12-3 as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) count(s) 1-11, 12, 13-16. (Villano, P.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2013
Arrest of Jesse C. Litvak (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Jesse C. Litvak, INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Jesse C. Litvak (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: granting 3 Motion to Unseal Case as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); Initial Appearance held on 1/28/2013; Arraignment held on 1/28/2013; Plea entered Not Guilty on counts 1-16; Defendant's motions due 3/11/13, Government's responses due 4/10/13( Jury Selection set for 5/6/2013 09:00AM before Judge Janet C. Hall); Non-surety Bond set $1,000,000; Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 1/28/2013 re 3 MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA. 27 minutes(Court Reporter Baldwin.) (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Jesse C. Litvak (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 1/28/13. (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
7 7 Non-surety Bond Entered as to Jesse C. Litvak in amount of $1,000,000 (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/28/13. (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
9 9 Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to Jesse C. Litvak Passport Number 497801119 issued by USA Receipt Number 49 (Barrille, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Passport Receipt
Wednesday, January 30, 2013
10 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2013
11 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 4/1/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. If the defendant is in custody, defense counsel is reminded that civilian clothing is required for defendant's appearance in court for jury selection and jury trial. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
12 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ross H. Garber appearing for Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
13 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew M. Zeitlin appearing for Jesse C. Litvak (Zeitlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric J. Lubochinski appearing for Jesse C. Litvak (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Travel by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2013
16 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Sarah Zimmer. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005167. by Jesse C. Litvak. (Falcone, K.)
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Patrick J. Smith. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005166. by Jesse C. Litvak. (Falcone, K.)
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: John M. Hillebrecht. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005165. by Jesse C. Litvak. (Falcone, K.)
Related: [-]
19 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Courtney G. Saleski. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005168. by Jesse C. Litvak. (Falcone, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2013
Attorney update in case as to Jesse C. Litvak. Attorney Courtney G. Saleski for Jesse C. Litvak added. (Villano, P.)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jesse C. Litvak. Attorney Patrick Joseph Smith for Jesse C. Litvak added. (Villano, P.)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jesse C. Litvak. Attorney John Michael Hillebrecht for Jesse C. Litvak added. (Villano, P.)
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) Certificates of Good Standing due by 4/9/2013. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2013. (Falcone, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2013
21 21 ORDER granting15 Motion to Travel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/13/2013. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
22 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: John M. Hillebrecht. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005165. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
23 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Courtney G. Saleski. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005168. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
24 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Patrick J. Smith. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005166. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
25 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Sarah Zimmer. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005167. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
26 26 MOTION for extension of time to Continue Scheduling Order by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan) Modified on 2/14/2013 to correct relief(Falcone, K.).
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 3/13/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2013
28 28 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference on Criminal Case 13cr19 & Civil Case 13cv132 set for 3/13/2013 has been changed to 2:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Amended calendar as to time change only) (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2013
29 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing/Status Conference as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 3/13/2013; granting26 Motion for Extension of Time as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Speedy Trial Act Findings made on the record, the Court finds that the time period of delay from April 1, 2013 to and including March 1, 2014, is hereby excluded pursuant to Title 18, U.S.C. 3161(h)(7). Calendar will issue - counsel will confer and respond re dates. Bond modified to reflect dft may travel within U.S. with prior notification to USPO. Travel outside the U.S. will require prior permission from the court. 21 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2013
30 30 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on March 13, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2013. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2013
31 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2013
32 32 MOTION for Order Re: Schedule by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2013
33 33 MOTION For Entry of Scheduling Order by Jesse C. Litvak.(Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2013
34 34 ORDER granting33 Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/2/2013. (Lewis, D) Modified on 4/8/2013 (Lewis, D). Modified on 4/9/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
36 36 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak Proposed Voir Dire Questions due 11/8/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions due 11/8/2013 Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/2/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2013
35 35 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Courtney G. Saleski. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005168. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2013
37 37 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2013
38 38 ORDER denying in part32 Motion for Order as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). See Order36 re defendant's33 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/10/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2013
39 39 NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross) Modified on 5/1/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2013
40 40 RULING denying39 ExParte Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) without prejudice to renew. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/30/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2013
41 41 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Pending Trial by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2013
42 42 ORDER granting41 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/17/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2013
43 43 MOTION for Eric Lubochinski to Withdraw as Attorney by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lubochinski, Eric)
Related: [-]
44 44 MOTION to Continue Certain Dates in Scheduling Order by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2013
45 45 RESPONSE/REPLY by Jesse C. Litvak re44 Motion to Continue (Smith, Patrick)
Related: [-]
46 46 ORDER granting43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Eric J. Lubochinski withdrawn from case. as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/26/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2013
47 47 ORDER granting44 Motion to Continue as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2013
48 48 USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Jesse C. Litvak on 1/28/13 (Torrenti, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2013
49 49 NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross) Modified on 7/25/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2013
50 50 MOTION for Discovery a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with Jesse C. Litvak's Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross). Added MOTION for Hearing on 7/15/2013 (Torrenti, R.).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion Seeking Discovery and a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with His Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-10
Thursday, July 25, 2013
51 51 EX PARTE RULING denying49 ExParte Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/24/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 27, 2013
52 52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Dismiss the Indictment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Unreported Authorities
Monday, July 29, 2013
53 53 Memorandum in Support by Jesse C. Litvak re52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Dismiss the Indictment (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2013
54 54 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re50 MOTION for Discovery a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with Jesse C. Litvak's Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process MOTION for Hearing(Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3
Friday, August 16, 2013
55 55 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re50 MOTION for Discovery a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with Jesse C. Litvak's Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process MOTION for Hearing(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6
Friday, August 23, 2013
56 56 NOTICE OF AMENDED E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2013 has been changed to 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Amended calendar as to time change only.) (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2013
57 57 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: At the hearing scheduled for 9/9/2013, the court will address50 MOTION for Discovery a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with Jesse C. Litvak's Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process MOTION for Hearing filed by Jesse C. Litvak. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/27/2013. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
58 58 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set for 9/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment . (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2013
59 59 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Discovery and Hearing by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak.(Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Sur-Reply
Monday, September 09, 2013
60 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 9/9/2013; taking under advisement50 Motion for Discovery as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); taking under advisement50 Motion for Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak. 58 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
61 61 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2013
62 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on September 9, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2013
63 63 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/25/2013. Hearing has been changed to 9/27/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment .(DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2013
64 64 ORDER GRANTING in part and otherwise DENYING50 Motion for Discovery and Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak (1);. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/17/13. (Pesta, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2013
65 65 MOTION to Compel Discovery , MOTION for Discovery by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Compel Discovery,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-12
66 66 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2013
67 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 9/27/2013; taking under advisement52 Motion to Dismiss as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Total Time: 1 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2013
68 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on September 27, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2013
69 69 ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak re50 MOTION for Discovery filed by Jesse C. Litvak. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/1/2013. (Lewis, D) (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2013
70 70 NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2013
71 71 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael G Chase appearing for Jesse C. Litvak (Chase, Michael)
Related: [-]
72 72 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re65 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Discovery (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2013
73 73 CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak, Held on September 27, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2013
74 74 Consent MOTION for Order Re: Modified Scheduling Order by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross) Modified on 10/21/2013 (Malone, P.).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Modified Scheduling Order
Monday, October 21, 2013
75 75 ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak re70 Notice (Other) filed by Jesse C. Litvak. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
76 76 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral Argument set for 11/4/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
78 78 RULING denying52 Motion to Dismiss as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2013
79 79 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Pre-Trial Subpoenas Duces Tecum re75 Order REDACTED by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Thursday, October 24, 2013
80 80 ORDER granting74 Motion for Extension of Time as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
81 81 MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak Proposed Voir Dire Questions due 11/8/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions due 11/8/2013 Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2013. (Lewis, D) Modified on 10/24/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
82 82 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. If the defendant is in custody, defense counsel is reminded civilian clothing is needed for the defendant's appearance at jury selection and trial. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2013
83 83 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re65 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Discovery (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 30, 2013
84 84 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re79 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Pre-Trial Subpoenas Duces Tecum re75 Order REDACTED (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2013
85 85 ORAL MOTION to Modify Conditions of Bond to allow defendant to have contact with Bryan Bernard and Stewart Lippman by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
86 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 11/4/2013; granting59 Motion for Leave to File as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying as stated on the record65 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying as stated on the record65 Motion for Discovery as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying as stated on the record79 Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting 85 Motion to Modify Conditions of Bond as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) to allow defendant Litvak to have contact with Bryan Bernard and Stewart Lippman. Total Time: 1 hours and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2013
87 87 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/10/2013 Jury Trial has been changed to 2/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
88 88 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Voir Dire and Jury Instructions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2013
89 89 ORDER granting88 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Voir Dire and Jury Instructions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/7/2013. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2013
90 90 Proposed Voir Dire by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
91 91 Proposed Jury Instructions by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
92 92 Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
93 93 Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2013
94 94 MOTION To Adjourn Certain Trial Dates by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan) Modified on 11/20/2013 to correct event relief (Pesta, J.).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2013
95 95 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Motions in Limine until 12/03/2013 by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2013
96 96 ORDER granting94 Motion for Extension of Time to adjorn certain trial dates for Jesse C. Litvak (1) as to February 28, 2014. The Court will discuss the request re: February 27 and March 1 at the next conference/hearing. SO ORDEREDby Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/21/13. (Pesta, J.)
Related: [-]
97 97 ORDER granting95 Motion for Extension of Time to file motion in limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/21/13. (Pesta, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2013
98 98 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
99 99 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Suggesting the Absence of Criminal Activity in Uncharged Transactions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
100 100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Purported Selective Prosecution by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
101 101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Hearsay Statements in Electronic Communications by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
102 102 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Offering Rule 16 Evidence at Trial by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
103 103 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness and Exhibit Lists by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
104 104 MOTION in Limine (i) to preclude the government from adducing any evidence concerning Mr. Litvaks compensation at Jefferies & Co., Inc.; (ii) to preclude the government from eliciting any evidence regarding the use of taxpayer funds in the United States Department of Treasurys Legacy Securities Public-Private Investment Program and any alleged harm to U.S. taxpayers; (iii) to appropriately limit the admission of evidence of approximately 50 uncharged RMBS trades; and (iv) to bar the admission of certain proposed government exhibits by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motions in Limine
Wednesday, December 11, 2013
105 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to amend Defendant's expert notice until January 17, 2014 by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
106 106 MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan) Modified on 12/18/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2013
107 107 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re104 MOTION in Limine (i) to preclude the government from adducing any evidence concerning Mr. Litvaks compensation at Jefferies & Co., Inc.; (ii) to preclude the government from eliciting any evidence regarding the use of taxpayer funds in the United S (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
108 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with Fed. R. Crim. P. 16(b)(1)(C) , MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Expert Testimony by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
109 109 Memorandum in Opposition by Jesse C. Litvak re98 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims ,101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Hearsay Statements in Electronic Communications ,99 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Suggesting the Absence of Criminal Activity in Uncharged Transactions ,102 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Offering Rule 16 Evidence at Trial ,100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Purported Selective Prosecution (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 14, 2013
110 110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
111 111 Memorandum in Support by Jesse C. Litvak re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14
Monday, December 16, 2013
112 112 RESPONSE/REPLY by Jesse C. Litvak re106 Motion for Order Re: Protective Order (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
113 113 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on November 4, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2013
114 114 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re106 MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
115 115 SEALED MOTION To Seal - by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
116 116 SEALED MOTION - by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
117 117 ENTERED IN ERROR - ORDER denying105 Motion for Extension of Time to amend Defendant's expert notice until January 17, 2014 as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). The court orders the defendant to properly disclose its experts by noon on December 24, 2013. Failure to do so will result in experts not properly disclosed being precluded. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/17/2013. (Lewis, D) Modified on 12/18/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
118 118 ORDER denying105 Motion for Extension of Time as to Jesse C. Litvak (1).The court orders the defendant to properly disclose its experts by noon on December 24, 2013. Failure to do so will result in experts not properly disclosed being precluded. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/17/2013. (Lewis, D) (Document #117 corrected) Modified on 12/18/2013 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2013
119 119 ORDER granting115 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
120 120 ORDER granting106 Motion for Order as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
121 121 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2013. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
122 122 SEALED MOTION Motion to Seal - by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
123 123 Sealed Document: Sealed Opposition by Jesse C. Litvak re116 SEALED MOTION - - (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
124 124 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re104 MOTION in Limine (i) to preclude the government from adducing any evidence concerning Mr. Litvaks compensation at Jefferies & Co., Inc.; (ii) to preclude the government from eliciting any evidence regarding the use of taxpayer funds in the United S (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
125 125 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Reschedule Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference Presently Scheduled for January 3, 2014 by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
126 126 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re98 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims ,101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Hearsay Statements in Electronic Communications ,99 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Suggesting the Absence of Criminal Activity in Uncharged Transactions ,102 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Offering Rule 16 Evidence at Trial ,100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Purported Selective Prosecution (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2013
127 127 SEALED MOTION - TO SEAL by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
128 128 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re116 SEALED MOTION - - (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2013
129 129 Memorandum in Opposition by Jesse C. Litvak re103 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness and Exhibit Lists (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
130 130 NOTICE of Additional Brady and Discovery Violations by Jesse C. Litvak re111 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
131 131 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2013
132 132 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 12/30/2013 3:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
133 133 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 12/30/2013 . Status Conference has been changed to 12/30/2013 3:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Calendar is changed as to time only.) (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
134 134 ORDER granting122 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting127 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/26/2013. (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2013
135 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: taking under advisement110 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting116 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting125 Motion for Extension of Time to Continue Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying131 Motion to Continue Trial Date as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Pending Motions will be addressed at the Pretrial Conference on 1/10/2014. Total Time: 1 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2014
136 136 Memorandum in Support by Jesse C. Litvak re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions Related [+](Garber, Ross)
Related: [-] dacted Memorandum
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED),
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED),
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED),
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Sunday, January 05, 2014
137 137 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on December 30, 2013 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2014
138 138 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference/Continued Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 has been changed to 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
139 139 MOTION to Seal Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
140 140 Sealed Document: Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re139 MOTION to Seal Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions - (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
141 141 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions REDACTED (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2014
142 142 ORDER granting139 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2014
143 143 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2014 has been changed to 12:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2014
144 144 MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak.(Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
145 145 MOTION to Seal Mr. Litvak's Unredacted Reply to the Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions and Documents Subject to the Protective Order by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
146 146 Sealed Document: Jesse C. Litvak's [Unredacted] Reply to the Government's Opposition to Mr. Litvak's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions and Sealed Exhbit 1 by Jesse C. Litvak re145 MOTION to Seal Mr. Litvak's Unredacted Reply to the Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions and Documents Subject to the Protective Order,110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions -(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Sealed)
147 147 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, January 10, 2014
157 157 Motion Hearing/Pretrial Conference as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 1/10/2014; granting98 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting in part as stated on the record99 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting100 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying without prejudice to renew101 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying without prejudice to renew102 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); terminating as moot103 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting in part and denying in part104 Motion in Limine as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) as follows: part (i) is denied to the extent the government can connect fraudulent transactions to Mr. Litvak's income and without prejudice to defendant's moving for a proposed limiting instruction, part (ii) is denied without prejudice to renew or to move for a limiting instruciton, part (iii) is denied without prejudice to renew with respect to particular evidence or exhibits, part (iv) is terminated without prejudice; terminating as moot without prejudice to renew108 Motion to Compel, Motion to Preclude as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); taking under advisement110 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting144 Motion for Order as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting145 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); government has until 1/17 to submit any motion re Daubert; defendant has until 1/24 to submit any opposition; motions to exclude exhibits due by 1/31.Total Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) Modified on 1/23/2014 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2014
148 148 MOTION to Seal Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Supplement the Record and Exhibit 1 by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
149 149 SEALED MOTION to Supplement the Record - by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Sealed)
150 150 MOTION to Supplement the Record re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Sunday, January 12, 2014
151 151 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Conference re110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions by Jesse C. Litvak set for 1/13/2014 at 4:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 773-2428. (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
152 152 RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re150 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (REDACTED) (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
153 153 MOTION to Seal Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Supplement the Record by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
154 154 Sealed Document: Government's Response to Defendant's149 and150 Motion to Supplement the Record by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan) Modified on 1/13/2014 To create link to motions. (Malone, P.).
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2014
155 155 ORDER granting153 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/13/02014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
156 156 ORDER granting148 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/13/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
158 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: denying, for the reasons stated on the record,110 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting149 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); terminating, as moot,150 Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); Telephonic Conference as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 1/13/2014. Total time: 18 minutes. (Court Reporter Terri Fidanza) (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2014
159 159 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Type of Hearing: Telephonic Ruling. Held on January 13, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
160 160 MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Proposed Expert Testimony by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak.(Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 21, 2014
161 161 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Type of Hearing: Pretrial. Held on January 10, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2014
162 162 Consent MOTION for Order Re: Permission to Bring Computer Equipment Into The Courtroom by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion for Permission to Bring Computer Equipment Into The Courtroom,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3
163 163 NOTICE Government's Proffer of Scheme Evidence by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
164 164 Memorandum in Opposition by Jesse C. Litvak re160 MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Proposed Expert Testimony (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 and 2
Sunday, January 26, 2014
165 165 MOTION to Seal Government's Notice by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
166 166 Sealed Document: Government's Notice by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re165 MOTION to Seal Government's Notice - (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2014
167 167 MOTION to Seal Jesse C. Litvak's Response to Government's Notice by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
168 168 Sealed Document: Jesse C. Litvak's Response to Government's Notice by Jesse C. Litvak re166 Sealed Document,167 MOTION to Seal Jesse C. Litvak's Response to Government's Notice - (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2014
169 169 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re160 MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Proposed Expert Testimony (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2014
170 170 ORDER granting162 Motion for Order as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting165 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting167 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/31/2014. (Lamb, K.)
Related: [-]
171 171 ORDER as to Jesse C. Litvak re162 Consent MOTION for Order Re: Permission to Bring Computer Equipment Into The Courtroom filed by Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/31/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
172 172 NOTICE of Government's Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
173 173 NOTICE of Defense Objections to Government Exhibits by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2014
Attorney update in case as to Jesse C. Litvak. Attorney Kathleen Burdette Shields for Securities & Exchange Commission added. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jesse C. Litvak. Attorney Rua M. Kelly for Securities & Exchange Commission added. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
174 174 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2014 11:15 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to160 MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Proposed Expert Testimony .(DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
175 175 SEALED MOTION to Seal - by Securities & Exchange Commission as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
176 176 SEALED MOTION to Quash by Securities & Exchange Commission as to Jesse C. Litvak.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
177 177 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set for 2/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to Jesse C. Litvak176 SEALED MOTION to Quash -,175 SEALED MOTION to Seal. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
178 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Voir Dire begun on 2/3/2014 as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) on Count 1-11,12,13-16, Jury Selection as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/3/2014, ( Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2014 11:15 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall, Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall) Trial continued to 2/18/2014. Total Time: 5 hours and 32 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2014
179 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Securities & Exchange Commission as to Jesse C. Litvak (Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
180 180 NOTICE OF AMENDED E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set for Thursday 2/6/2014 has been changed to 12:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to176 SEALED MOTION to Quash -,175 SEALED MOTION to Seal. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
181 181 RESPONSE/REPLY by Jesse C. Litvak re172 Notice (Other) Jesse C. Litvak's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2014
182 182 Sealed Document: Jesse C. Litvak's Opposition to Motion of Non-Party Securities and Exchange Commission to Quash by Jesse C. Litvak re176 SEALED MOTION to Quash - -(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
183 183 Proposed Jury Instructions by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
184 184 Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
185 185 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re169 Reply to Response (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
186 186 RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re173 Notice (Other) (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2014
187 187 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/6/2014; granting in part and denying in part as stated on the record160 Motion to Preclude as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting175 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting176 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1)( Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall). Total Time: 2 hours and 56 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
188 188 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
189 189 ENTERED IN ERROR - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Calendar Call held on 2/6/2014. Possible referral to Magistrate Judge Margolis; Separtate jury selection and trial calendar to issue. 9 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D) Modified on 2/7/2014 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2014
190 190 Docket Entry Correction as to Jesse C. Litvak re189 Docket Call, modified to indicate this was entered on this case in error. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
191 191 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Pretrial Conference as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/7/2014. Total Time: 1 hours and 31 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2014
192 192 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Type of Hearing: Pretrial. Held on February 6, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
193 193 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Type of Hearing: Pretrial. Held on February 7, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2014
194 194 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Agents' Notes - by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross) Modified on 2/19/2014 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Sealed Motion to Compel Agents' Notes,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Sunday, February 16, 2014
195 195 MOTION to Amend/Correct Typographical Error in Count 8 of the Indictment by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak.(Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 17, 2014
196 196 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re194 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Agents' Notes - (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
197 197 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
198 198 Witness List Witness List by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
199 199 Proposed Exhibit List by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2014
DISMISSAL OF COUNT 7 of the Indictment as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
200 200 ORAL MOTION to bring computer equipment into courtroom during trial by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
201 201 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/18/2014; taking under advisement194 Sealed Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting over objection195 Motion to Amend/Correct as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting absent objection197 Motion to Dismiss as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting as stated on the record 200 Oral Motion to bring computer equipment into courtroom as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); Jury Trial Continued Until 2/19/2014. Total Time: 6 hours and 22 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
202 202 ORDER re Computer Equipment in the Courtroom as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/18/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2014
203 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/19/2014; denying as stated on the record194 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Agents' Notes filed by Jesse C. Litvak; Jury Trial Continued Until 2/20/2014. Total Time: 6 hours and 03 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
204 204 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Thursday, February 20, 2014
205 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/20/2014; taking under advisement204 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by Jesse C. Litvak; Jury Trial Continued Until 2/21/2014. Total Time: 7 hours and 46 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2014
206 206 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/21/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 2/24/2014 Total Time: 5 hours and 43 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2014
207 207 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re92 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
208 208 TRIAL MEMO Jesse C. Litvak's Supplemental Memorandum Concerning the Courts Draft Jury Charges by Jesse C. Litvak(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 24, 2014
209 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/24/2014; terminating as moot204 Motion to Compel as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); Jury Trial Continued Until 2/25/2014. Total Time: 6 hours and 36 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2014
210 210 TRIAL MEMO of Defendant Jesse C. Litvak in Support of [Oral] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(A) by Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
211 211 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/25/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 2/26/2014 Total Time: 6 hours and 02 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2014
212 212 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
213 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/26/2014; taking under advisement 212 Motion for Directed Verdict as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); Jury Trial Continued Until 2/27/2014. Total Time: 7 hours and 55 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2014
214 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/27/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 3/4/2014 Total Time: 5 hours and 56 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
215 215 TRIAL MEMO Supplemental Memorandum re Jury Instructions by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2014
218 218 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 2/28/2014 re charge conference. Jury Trial Continued Until 3/4/2014 Total Time: 2 hours and 13 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2014
216 216 TRIAL MEMO Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Supplemental Memorandum Providing Additional Authority Requested by the Court Relating to the Court's Draft Jury Charges by Jesse C. Litvak(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
217 217 TRIAL MEMO Supplemental Memorandum re Court's Proposed Jury Charge by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2014
219 219 NOTICE Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Proffer of Certain Excluded Evidence Supporting His Good Faith by Jesse C. Litvak(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
220 220 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak re continued charge conference held on 3/3/2014. Jury Trial Continued Until 3/4/2014 Total Time: 1 hours and 05 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2014
221 221 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 3/4/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 3/5/2014 Total Time: 5 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
222 222 TRIAL MEMO Re Conscious Avoidance Charge in Count 12 of Proposed Charge by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
223 223 TRIAL MEMO Jesse C. Litvak's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Objections to the Court's Revised Jury Charges by Jesse C. Litvak(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, March 05, 2014
224 224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 3/5/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 3/6/2014. Total Time: 6 hours and 33 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
225 225 Jury Charge as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2014
226 226 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Jury Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 3/6/2014 Jury Trial Continued Until 3/7/2014. 05 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2014
227 227 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to file post trial motions. by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
228 228 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 3/7/2014; granting 227 Oral Motion for Extension of Time as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); ( Sentencing set for 5/30/2014 04:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall). 18 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
229 229 JURY VERDICT as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) Guilty on Counts 1-6,8-11,12,13-16 of the Indictment. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
230 230 Marked Court Exhibit List as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
231 231 Marked Witness List as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
232 232 Marked Government Exhibit List as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
233 233 Marked Defendant's Exhibit List as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2014
234 234 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO PROBATION FOR PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION AND REPORT as to Jesse C. Litvak. First Disclosure-PSI due 4/18/2014 Objections Due 5/2/2014 2nd-Disclosure PSI due 5/12/2014 Sentencing Memorandum due 5/19/2014 Response due 5/24/2014 Sentencing set for 5/30/2014 04:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/20/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2014
235 235 Letter re Return of Government Exhibits as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2014
236 236 Acknowledgment of Receipt of trial exhibits by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re235 Letter. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2014
237 237 MOTION for Acquittal , MOTION for New Trial by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Motions for Judgment of Acquittal Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(C) and for a New Trial Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 33
Monday, April 14, 2014
238 238 PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Draft Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Jesse C. Litvak. (available to USA, Jesse C. Litvak)(Lopez, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Goverment's Loss Table,
Att: 3 Defedant's Statement of Offense,
Att: 4 Financial Statement
Friday, April 18, 2014
239 239 First MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2014
Docket Entry Correction re 240 Order on Motion to Continue, Modified to indicate this was entered in error. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
240 240 ENTERED IN ERROR - ORDER granting239 Motion to Continue as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/21/2014. (Lewis, D) Modified on 4/21/2014 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2014
242 242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial until May 12, 2014 by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2014
243 243 ORDER granting242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/23/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
244 244 ORDER granting over objection239 Motion to Continue as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/23/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
245 245 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/30/2014 Sentencing has been changed to 7/17/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2014
246 246 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2014
247 247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial ,246 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Unopposed) until June 9, 2014 by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2014
248 248 ORDER granting247 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/19/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 09, 2014
249 249 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jesse C. Litvak re237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Jesse C. Litvak in Further Support of Motions for Judgment of Acquittal Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) and for a New Trial Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 10, 2014
250 250 PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Final Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Jesse C. Litvak. (available to USA, Jesse C. Litvak)(Lopez, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Government's Loss Table,
Att: 3 Defendant's Statement of the Offense,
Att: 4 Financial Statement,
Att: 5 Addendum,
Att: 6 USAO PSR Objections,
Att: 7 USAO Exhibit
251 251 Sealed Sentencing Recommendation: as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lopez, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 11, 2014
252 252 MOTION for Eric J. Glover to Withdraw as Attorney by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Glover, Eric)
Related: [-]
253 253 PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Supplement) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Jesse C. Litvak. (available to USA, Jesse C. Litvak)(Lopez, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PSR Objections,
Att: 2 Exhibits
Thursday, June 12, 2014
254 254 ORDER granting252 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Eric J. Glover withdrawn from case. as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
255 255 MOTION for Order Re: Directing Probation to Prepare a Revised Final Presentence Report by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Thursday, June 19, 2014
256 256 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sentencing Memoranda until June 27, 2014 and Responsive Sentencing Memoranda until July 8, 2014, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jesse C. Litvak. (Chase, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 23, 2014
257 257 ORDER granting256 Motion for Extension of Time as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); granting256 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 24, 2014
258 258 ORDER denying255 MOTION for Order Re: Directing Probation to Prepare a Revised Final Presentence Report by Jesse C. Litvak. Motion is denied in light of filing of Second Addendum to the PSR (Doc. No. 253). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2014. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
259 259 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 7/17/2014. Sentencing has been changed to 7/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 27, 2014
260 260 SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
261 261 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Sentencing Memorandum and Certain Exhibits in Support by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
262 262 SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Jesse C. Litvak(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Part I,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Part II,
Att: 3 Exhibit A, Part III,
Att: 4 Exhibit A, Part IV,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Z
Monday, June 30, 2014
263 263 ORDER granting261 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). The court agrees to seal these documents at this time. However, it is likely that, under current Circuit law, they will be unsealed if they are expected by defendant to be relied on by the court in determining sentence. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/30/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
264 264 Sealed Document: Sentencing Memorandum And Exhibits A-D In Support by Jesse C. Litvak re262 Sentencing Memorandum.(Malone, P.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit A Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D
Wednesday, July 02, 2014
265 265 RULINGdenying 212 Motion for Directed Verdict as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying237 Motion for Acquittal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1); denying237 Motion for New Trial as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
266 266 RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re262 Sentencing Memorandum (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
267 267 RESPONSE/REPLY by Jesse C. Litvak re260 Sentencing Memorandum(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to Reply Sentencing Memorandum of Defendant Jesse C. Litvak
Tuesday, July 22, 2014
268 268 MOTION to Supplement the Record at Sentencing re262 Sentencing Memorandum by Jesse C. Litvak.(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Part V
Wednesday, July 23, 2014
269 269 ORDER granting268 Motion as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/23/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
271 271 ORAL MOTION for Bond pending appeal by Jesse C. Litvak. (Lewis, D) Modified on 7/24/2014 (Lewis, D).
Related: [-]
272 272 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Sentencing/Motion Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 7/23/2014; denying 271 Motion for Bond as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). Total Time: 4 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 24, 2014
270 270 PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT Related [+] (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Jesse C. Litvak. (available to USA, Jesse C. Litvak) (Lopez, R.)
Related: [-] vised
Friday, July 25, 2014
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?crsurvey (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
273 273 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Type of Hearing: Sentencing. Held on July 23, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2014. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
274 274 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Jesse C. Litvak: The defendant is hereby ORDERED to re-file the relevant materials with unwarranted redactions removed to the extent he concedes that they should no longer be sealed. The defendant is further ORDERED to show cause why any other portions of the information filed under seal pursuant to the courts prior Order (Doc. No. 264) should remain sealed. The defendant shall submit a response to this Order by August 7, 2014. The government shall submit a response by August 21, 2014. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2014 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
275 275 JUDGMENT as to Jesse C. Litvak (1), Count(s) 1-6, 12, 13-16, 8-11, The defendant is sentenced to 24 months imprisonment on each of counts 1-6 and 8-16, all to run concurrently, for a total term of imprisonment of 24 months; 3 years supervised release on each of counts 1-6 and 8-16, all to run concurrently, for a total term of supervised release of 3 years with standard, mandatory and special conditions imposed; $1,500 special assessment; Fine in the amount of $1,750,000; Restitution to be determined and Order of Restitution to be entered upon filing of submission by the government within 45 days; Count(s) 7, Dismissed on government motion. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 01, 2014
276 276 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of273 Transcript,,,, by Ross H. Garber in case as to Jesse C. Litvak (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 05, 2014
277 277 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jesse C. Litvak re275 Judgment,, Filing fee $ 505, receipt number CTXN00008656. (Campbell, A) (Campbell, A).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/11/2014) Attachment
Thursday, August 07, 2014
278 278 MOTION to Seal Response to Order to Show Cause by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
279 279 Sealed Document: Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Jesse C. Litvak re274 Order to Show Cause,, - (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 15, 2014
280 280 Transcript Redaction Request in case as to Jesse C. Litvak re273 Transcript,,,, filed by attorney Ross H. Garber (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
281 281 INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL by Jesse C. Litvak re277 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment,25 Certificate of Good Standing,234 Order for PSI and Report,61 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Dismissal of Counts Motion,59 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Discovery and Hearing ,14 Attorney Appearance - Defendant,86 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,272 Order on Motion for Bond, Sentencing, Motion Hearing,,, 142 Order on Motion to Seal,187 Order on Motion to Preclude, Order on Sealed Motion,, Pretrial Conference, Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,235 Letter,205 Order on Motion to Compel, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing,,,219 Notice (Other), 120 Order on Motion for Order,98 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims ,165 MOTION to Seal Government's Notice,216 Trial Memo, 82 Calendar Entry,, 89 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,39 EX PARTE MOTION,252 MOTION for Eric J. Glover to Withdraw as Attorney , 28 Calendar Entry,274 Order to Show Cause,,116 SEALED MOTION - , 3 MOTION to Unseal Case,203 Order on Sealed Motion, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing,,,127 SEALED MOTION - TO SEAL ,81 Scheduling Order,182 Sealed Document,210 Trial Memo,236 Acknowledgment of Receipt, 155 Order on Motion to Seal, 46 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,181 Reply/Response Misc,233 Exhibit List,109 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, 263 Order on Motion to Seal,113 Transcript,,,,99 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Suggesting the Absence of Criminal Activity in Uncharged Transactions ,146 Sealed Document,, 80 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,33 MOTION For Entry of Scheduling Order , 133 Calendar Entry,201 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,191 Pretrial Conference,26 MOTION for Extension of Time,125 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Reschedule Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference Presently Scheduled for January 3, 2014 ,211 Jury Trial,71 Attorney Appearance - Defendant,103 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness and Exhibit Lists , 245 Calendar Entry, 57 Notice, 42 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release,196 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 170 Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Seal,224 Jury Trial,164 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,92 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge,171 Order,147 Reply to Response,106 MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order ,102 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Offering Rule 16 Evidence at Trial ,23 Certificate of Good Standing,184 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge,176 SEALED MOTION to Quash -,88 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Voir Dire and Jury Instructions ,100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Purported Selective Prosecution , 56 Calendar Entry,55 Reply to Response, 188 Calendar Entry,4 Order on Motion to Unseal Case, Initial Appearance, Arraignment, Plea Entered, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Bond Set/Reset, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,266 Reply/Response Misc, 143 Calendar Entry,66 Reply to Response,75 Order,7 Bond,144 MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order ,16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Sarah Zimmer. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005167.,232 Exhibit List, 119 Order on Sealed Motion,117 Order on Motion for Order,206 Jury Trial,194 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Agents' Notes - ,198 Witness List,111 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,168 Sealed Document, 85 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release,256 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sentencing Memoranda until June 27, 2014 and Responsive Sentencing Memoranda until July 8, 2014 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ,130 Notice (Other),12 Attorney Appearance - Defendant,140 Sealed Document,40 Order on ExParte Motion,72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,215 Trial Memo,195 MOTION to Amend/Correct Typographical Error in Count 8 of the Indictment , 27 Calendar Entry,73 Transcript,,,,104 MOTION in Limine (i) to preclude the government from adducing any evidence concerning Mr. Litvaks compensation at Jefferies & Co., Inc.; (ii) to preclude the government from eliciting any evidence regarding the use of taxpayer funds in the United S, 20 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,,,,, 161 Transcript,,,, 5 Bail Information Sheet, 35 Certificate of Good Standing, 227 MOTION for Extension of Time, 132 Calendar Entry, 172 Notice (Other), 271 MOTION for Bond, 54 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 36 Scheduling Order, 58 Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 135 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Continue, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,, 248 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 139 MOTION to Seal Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions, 128 Sealed Document, 204 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena , 218 Jury Trial, 137 Transcript,,,, 95 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Motions in Limine until 12/03/2013, 237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial , 13 Attorney Appearance - Defendant, 231 Witness List, 197 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven , 68 Transcript,,,, 151 Calendar Entry,, 41 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Pending Trial , 126 Reply to Response,, 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with Fed. R. Crim. P. 16(b)(1)(C) MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Expert Testimony , 136 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 47 Order on Motion to Continue, 246 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript, Motion Hearing, Status Conference,,,,,, 269 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 148 MOTION to Seal Jesse C. Litvak's Motion to Supplement the Record and Exhibit 1, 60 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Hearing, Motion Hearing,,, 261 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Sentencing Memorandum and Certain Exhibits in Support, 250 Presentence Investigation Report, 96 Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript, 34 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 207 Notice (Other), 199 Exhibit List, 162 Consent MOTION for Order Re: Permission to Bring Computer Equipment Into The Courtroom , 159 Transcript,,,, 32 MOTION for Order Re: Schedule , 200 MOTION to bring computer equipment into courtroom, 166 Sealed Document, 230 Exhibit List, 192 Transcript,,,, 138 Calendar Entry, 160 MOTION to Preclude Defendant's Proposed Expert Testimony , 97 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 65 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Discovery , 156 Order on Motion to Seal, 153 MOTION to Seal Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Supplement the Record, 9 Receipt for Passport, 121 Order, 249 Reply to Response, 52 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment , 115 SEALED MOTION To Seal - , 273 Transcript,,,, 76 Calendar Entry, 149 SEALED MOTION to Supplement the Record - , 260 Sentencing Memorandum, 91 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge, 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to amend Defendant's expert notice until January 17, 2014, 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release, 67 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,, 158 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Status Conference,,,, 48 USM Return Executed, 255 MOTION for Order Re: Directing Probation to Prepare a Revised Final Presentence Report , 94 MOTION for Extension of Time, 50 MOTION for Discovery a Hearing Concerning Governmental Interference with Jesse C. Litvak's Sixth Amendment Right to Counsel and His Fifth Amendment Right to Due Process MOTION for Hearing, 84 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 186 Reply/Response Misc, 179 Notice (Other), 268 MOTION to Supplement the Record at Sentencing re 262 Sentencing Memorandum , 223 Trial Memo, 212 MOTION for Directed Verdict, 123 Sealed Document, 79 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Pre-Trial Subpoenas Duces Tecum re 75 Order REDACTED , 74 MOTION for Extension of Time, 163 Notice (Other), 214 Jury Trial, 122 SEALED MOTION Motion to Seal - , 247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial , 246 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Unopposed) until June 9, 2014, 141 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 22 Certificate of Good Standing, 11 Calendar Entry, 259 Calendar Entry, 1 Indictment (Sealed), 110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions , 129 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 78 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 64 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Hearing, 118 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 114 Reply to Response, 93 Proposed Voir Dire, 124 Reply to Response, 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Patrick J. Smith. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005166., 239 First MOTION to Continue Sentencing , 208 Trial Memo, 169 Reply to Response, 37 Calendar Entry, 150 MOTION to Supplement the Record re 110 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions , 145 MOTION to Seal Mr. Litvak's Unredacted Reply to the Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure and for Sanctions and Documents Subject to the Protective Order, 180 Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 262 Sentencing Memorandum, 178 Voir Dire Begun, Jury Selection, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 69 Order, 265 Order on Motion for Directed Verdict, Order on Motion for Acquittal, Order on Motion for New Trial,,, 264 Sealed Document, 238 Presentence Investigation Report, 83 Reply to Response, 209 Order on Motion to Compel, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing,,, 51 Order on ExParte Motion, 221 Jury Trial, 31 Calendar Entry,, 183 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge, 70 Notice (Other), 240 Order on Motion to Continue, 229 Jury Verdict, 175 SEALED MOTION to Seal -, 101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Hearsay Statements in Electronic Communications , 217 Trial Memo, 257 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 45 Reply/Response Misc, 276 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Courtney G. Saleski. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005168., 254 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 177 Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 174 Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 226 Jury Trial, 173 Notice (Other), 107 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 243 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 202 Order, 152 Reply/Response Misc, 49 EX PARTE MOTION, 30 Transcript,,,, 220 Jury Trial, 38 Order on Motion for Order, 62 Transcript,,,, 131 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date , 63 Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 251 Sealed Sentencing Recommendation, 90 Proposed Voir Dire, 258 Order on Motion for Order, 15 MOTION to Travel, 185 Notice (Other), 134 Order on Sealed Motion, 222 Trial Memo, 193 Transcript,,,, 275 Judgment,, 43 MOTION for Eric Lubochinski to Withdraw as Attorney , 242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 237 MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial until May 12, 2014, 112 Reply/Response Misc, 244 Order on Motion to Continue, 253 Presentence Investigation Report, 8 Electronic Filing Order, 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: John M. Hillebrecht. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXN00005165., 228 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 21 Order on Motion to Travel, 267 Reply/Response Misc, 154 Sealed Document, 270 Presentence Investigation Report, 157 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Preclude,, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Seal, Pretrial Conference, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,, 87 Calendar Entry, 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 53 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 225 Jury Instructions/Charge, 167 MOTION to Seal Jesse C. Litvak's Response to Government's Notice, 213 Order on Motion for Directed Verdict, Jury Trial, Motion Hearing,,, 24 Certificate of Good Standing, 44 MOTION to Continue Certain Dates in Scheduling Order .For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
282 282 RESPONSE/REPLY by Jesse C. Litvak re274 Order to Show Cause,, Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Supplemental Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and Notice of Intent to Seek Additional Redaction (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 21, 2014
283 283 RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re274 Order to Show Cause,, (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 04, 2014
284 284 ORDER granting278 Motion to Seal as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/4/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 06, 2014
285 285 MOTION for Order Re: Entry of Order of Restitution by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak. (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
286 286 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Unopposed) by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 17, 2014
287 287 ORDER granting286 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/17/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 29, 2014
288 288 Memorandum in Opposition by Jesse C. Litvak re285 MOTION for Order Re: Entry of Order of Restitution Defendant Jesse C. Litvak's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Entry of Order of Restitution (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 03, 2014
289 289 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA (certified copy) Defendant Jesse C. Litvak, through counsel, moves for release pending appeal. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED because Litvak has raised a substantial question of law or fact likely to result in reversal. 18 U.S.C. 3143(b)(1). The conditions of release established by the district court shall remain in full force and effect during the pendency of this appeal. as to Jesse C. Litvak re277 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Malone, P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 08, 2014
290 290 RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Jesse C. Litvak re285 Motion for Order (Francis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
291 291 ORDER: In light of the Government's Reply (document #290 ) the court orders the285 Motion for Entry of Order of Restitution as to Jesse C. Litvak (1) withdrawn. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/10/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 27, 2014
292 292 ORDER TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/27/2014. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 13, 2015
293 293 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jesse C. Litvak: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bond Hearing set for 1/26/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2015
294 294 RULING re261 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Sentencing Memorandum and Certain Exhibits in Support as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/22/2015. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
295 295 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall:Violation/Bond Hearing as to Jesse C. Litvak held on 1/26/2015. Total Time: 1 hours and 03 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.)(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
296 296 CONSENT TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Jesse C. Litvak Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/26/2015. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
297 297 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Jesse C. Litvak Held on January 26, 2015 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2015. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
298 298 Redaction re273 Transcript,,,, as to Jesse C. Litvak held on July 23, 2014 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. Type of Hearing: Sentencing. (Fidanza, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
299 299 NOTICE of Substitute Filing by Jesse C. Litvak re294 Order(Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 New Redacted Sentencing Memorandum of Defendant Jesse C. Litvak,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Part I,
Att: 3 Exhibit A, Part II,
Att: 4 Exhibit A, Part III,
Att: 5 Exhibit A, Part IV
Monday, May 18, 2015
300 300 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Unopposed) by Jesse C. Litvak. (Garber, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
301 301 ORDER granting300 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jesse C. Litvak (1). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/19/2015. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
302 302 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Government Exhibits as to Jesse C. Litvak (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
303 303 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA (certified copy) reversing the District Court's judgment as to the fraud against the United States and making false statementscharges (Counts 1216), vacating the District Courts judgment as to the securities fraud charges (Counts 16, 811), and remanding for a new trial on the securities fraud charges. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
304 304 Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to Jesse C. Litvak Passport Number #302622644 issued by USA Receipt Number 9863 (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
Case Reopened (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
305 305 MANDATE of USCA dated February 3, 2016 Remanding re277 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment as to Jesse C. Litvak. The District Courts judgment of conviction as to the fraud against the United States and making false statementscharges (Counts 1216) is REVERSED. The judgment of conviction as to the securities fraudcharges (Counts 16, 811) is VACATED. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]