Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:04-bk-01124

Case Filed:Mar 09, 2006
Terminated:Apr 19, 2007
Counter-Claimant
James Gregory Barnes
Counter-Defendant
Colombo Bank, F.S.B.
Defendant
James Gregory Barnes
Plaintiff
Colombo Bank, F.S.B.

GPO Aug 30 2006
Memorandum Decision (Related Document(s) #:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding.) Order entered on 8/30/2006. (Myers, Sally)
GPO Sep 08 2006
Decision and Order RE Motion for Sanctions. (Related Document(s) #:19 Motion for Sanctions.) Ordered that the Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is Denied Without Prejudice to Renewal In the Event that the Plaintiff Controverts Ms. Nesse's Affidavit. Ordered that the Plaintiff May Re-Notice the Defendant's Deposition for a Mutually Agreeable Date to take Place no Later than 10/27/06. Order entered on 9/8/2006. (Myers, Sally)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.