Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-25075

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:16-ap-01714
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2016
Terminated:Nov 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ketan P. Patel
8 Maple Street
Chatham, NJ 07928
Represented By
Ketan P. Patel
contact info
Plaintiff
VoicePulse Inc.
1095 Cranbury South River Road Suite 16
Monroe Township, NJ 08831
Represented By
Anthony Sodono, III
Trenk, Dipasquale, Della Fera & Sodono, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, November 02, 2017
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 11/02 2:17 PM
Adversary Case (3:16-ap-1714) Closed. (wir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
31 31 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/27 3:01 PM
COPY OF DISTRICT COURT LETTER ORDER WITHDRAWING MOTION. (CV# 16-8515 Related [+]. Signed on 7/27/2017. (nrf)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Withdrawing The Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the District Court # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Counter-Claimant Ketan P. Patel, Defendant Ketan P. Patel
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
30 30 12 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 01/03 4:10 PM
Answer to Counterclaim filed by Brian W. Hofmeister, Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
29 29 37 pgs answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Mon 12/12 8:50 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel, Amended Counterclaim by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel against Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc. . (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 11, 2016
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/12 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/11/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/12 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/11/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
26 26 2 pgs order Mediation Order Fri 12/09 2:52 PM
Mediation Order. Andrew J. Kelly added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2016. (wir)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Joint Scheduling Order Fri 12/09 8:56 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2016. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Trial date set for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
court Hearing Held Thu 12/08 11:38 AM
Minute of 12/7/16; JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER SUBMITTED Related [+] (kmf )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, December 02, 2016
24 24 33 pgs answer|cmp Answer to Amended Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 12/02 4:51 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel, Counterclaim by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel against Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc. . (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/24 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/24 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
21 21 2 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/21 2:31 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2016. (kmf)
Related: [-] 9
20 20 3 pgs order Withdrawal of Reference Mon 11/21 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2016. (kmf)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
19 19 1 pgs court Document Wed 11/16 1:01 PM
Document re: Notice of Docketing Record on Motion to Withdraw the Reference. (CV# 16-8515 Judge Freda L. Wolfson Assigned. Related [+] (nrf)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Withdrawing The Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the District Court # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
18 18 1 pgs court Transmittal Memo - Generic Tue 11/15 10:15 AM
Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Related [+] (wir)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel
Monday, November 14, 2016
court Hearing Held Mon 11/14 2:19 PM
Minute of 11/14/2016; Hearing Held, OUTCOME:ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED; (DENIED) Related [+] (wir )
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Ketan P. Patel
court Hearing Held Mon 11/14 2:21 PM
Minute of 11/14/2016; Outcome: TO BE TRANSMITTED TO DISTRICT COURT; Related [+] (wir )
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Ketan P. Patel
Thursday, November 10, 2016
17 17 15 pgs answer Response Thu 11/10 4:58 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel. (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-] 15 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Eight, and Nine of the First Amended Adversary Complaint # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel) filed by Brian W. Hofmeister, Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification) filed by Plaintiff VoicePulse Inc., Interested Party Ravi Sakaria, Plaintiff Ravi Sakaria
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
16 16 9 pgs answer Response Thu 11/10 4:57 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel. (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-] 14 Brief in Opposition to (related document:10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Withdrawing The Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the District Court # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel) filed by Brian W. Hofmeister, Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. filed by Plaintiff VoicePulse Inc., Interested Party Ravi Sakaria, Plaintiff Ravi Sakaria
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 07, 2016
15 15 19 pgs answer Opposition Mon 11/07 6:19 PM
Brief in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister, Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Eight, and Nine of the First Amended Adversary Complaint # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel
Att: 1 Certification
14 14 14 pgs answer Opposition Mon 11/07 4:42 PM
Brief in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister, Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Withdrawing The Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the District Court # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 11/07 12:50 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/7/2016; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir )
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Ketan P. Patel
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 11/07 12:52 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/7/2016; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir )
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Ketan P. Patel
Sunday, October 30, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 10/31 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2016
12 12 13 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 10/28 3:37 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/28/2016 (wir)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
11 11 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 10/21 8:56 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 11/14/2016 at 10:00 am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (wir)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel,10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant Ketan P. Patel
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 10/18 9:10 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference([LINK 16-01714 MBK] ) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32945330, fee amount $ 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 10/18 9:10 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference([LINK 16-01714 MBK] ) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32945330, fee amount $ 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Friday, October 14, 2016
10 10 motion Withdrawal of Reference (Fee) Fri 10/14 2:12 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 25 pgs Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Withdrawing The Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the District Court
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/14 2:08 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ketan P. Patel.Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 25 pgs Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Eight, and Nine of the First Amended Adversary Complaint
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Att: 3 2 pgs Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 10/14 10:33 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by John J. Zefutie Jr on behalf of Ketan P. Patel. (Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/07 10:16 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of VoicePulse Inc.. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. Reason for amendment: Adding Ravi Sakaria as Plaintiff, through Joint Filing with Law Firm of Brian W. Hofmeister, LLC. filed by Plaintiff VoicePulse Inc., Interested Party Ravi Sakaria, Plaintiff Ravi Sakaria
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/07 10:12 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of VoicePulse Inc.. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01714 Complaint by VoicePulse Inc. against Ketan P. Patel. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) filed by Plaintiff VoicePulse Inc.,2 Summons Issued to VoicePulse, Inc for Service on Ketan P. Patel Answer due on 10/19/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/7/2016 at 02:00 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachments) (wdr)
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 09/27 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of VoicePulse Inc.. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
4 4 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/23 5:50 PM
Amended Complaint Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Ravi Sakaria, VoicePulse Inc.. Reason for amendment: Adding Ravi Sakaria as Plaintiff, through Joint Filing with Law Firm of Brian W. Hofmeister, LLC. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 09/23 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ravi Sakaria. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
2 2 1 pgs court Summons Issued Mon 09/19 5:16 PM
Summons Issued to VoicePulse, Inc for Service on Ketan P. Patel Answer due on 10/19/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/7/2016 at 02:00 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Friday, September 16, 2016
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/16 3:47 PM
Adversary case 16-01714 Complaint by VoicePulse Inc. against Ketan P. Patel. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 09/16 3:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 16-01714 MBK] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32766311, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1