Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:05-cr-80617
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2005
Terminated:Jan 17, 2020
Defendant
Adam Douglass
Defendant
Ahmad Duckett
Defendant
Andrew Marzett
Defendant
Annette Sanchez
Defendant
Annette Tyrrell
Defendant
Auntie
Defendant
B
Defendant
Baby D
Defendant
Blake
Defendant
Brian Smith
Defendant
Bro
Defendant
C
Defendant
CC
Defendant
Chapo
Defendant
Cleatus
Defendant
Cone
Defendant
Conehead
Defendant
Cun
Defendant
Cuz
Defendant
D
Defendant
Dale Gurley
Defendant
David Watson
Defendant
Deborah Robinson
Defendant
Dmarcio Jacquis Newsome
Defendant
Doc
Defendant
Dog
Defendant
E
Defendant
Edward Walker
Defendant
F
Defendant
G
Defendant
Giovanni Ruanova
Defendant
Israel Corral
Defendant
James Wordad
Defendant
Jason Anderson
Defendant
Jason Taylor
Defendant
Jay
Defendant
Jeffrey Redmond
Defendant
John Adoud
Defendant
John Lemon
Defendant
JR
Defendant
Junior
Defendant
Kahkuyan Brewer
Defendant
L
Defendant
Lamont Daunielle Paris
Defendant
Lavert Dafney
Defendant
Lawrence Alexander
Defendant
Lawrence Allen
Defendant
Leon Pierce
Defendant
Little Rob
Defendant
Lloron
Defendant
Luis Montalvo Matos
Defendant
Man
Defendant
Mark King
Defendant
Mark Saldate
Defendant
Nutso
Defendant
Old Boy
Defendant
Old Girl
Defendant
Patricia Kay Guyton
Defendant
Pee Wee
Defendant
Preston Bingham
Defendant
Q
Defendant
Quan
Defendant
Quasand Daniell Lewis
Defendant
Quemado
Defendant
Ramarr Franklin
Defendant
Ray Amerson
Defendant
Red
Defendant
Rene
Defendant
Rich
Defendant
Richard Lonzo Burton
Defendant
Robin Wilson
Defendant
Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman
Defendant
Roman Dominguez-Haro
Defendant
Saeeda Walker
Defendant
Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell
Defendant
Shorty
Defendant
Sis
Defendant
Skinny
Defendant
Slick
Defendant
Slim
Defendant
T
Defendant
Tit
Defendant
Tromp
Defendant
Tromp G
Defendant
Trompas
Defendant
Tulani Dismuke
Defendant
V
Defendant
Vert
Defendant
Vito
Defendant
Walter Arlequin-Sanchez
Defendant
Willow
Defendant
Xevier Echevarria
Plaintiff
United States of America

GPO Jul 22 2005
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Robin Wilson Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, )
GPO Jul 22 2005
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Leon Pierce Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, )
GPO Aug 01 2005
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Lavert Dafney Signed by Honorable Steven D Pepe. (WBar, )
GPO Aug 01 2005
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Ray Amerson Signed by Honorable Steven D Pepe. (WBar, )
GPO Aug 30 2005
ORDER denying 154 Motion for Reconsideration re 154 MOTION for Reconsideration and Supplemental Brief in Support of Request for Pre-Trial Detention filed by USA, as to Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell (13). Signed by Honorable Avern Cohn. (JOwe, )
GPO Jan 23 2007
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Ahmad Duckett Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, )
GPO Jul 10 2008
ORDER denying 453 Motion for Paralegal Fees Under the Equal Access to Justict Act as to Lamont Daunielle Paris (25); denying 473 Motion for Demanded Judgment as to Lamont Daunielle Paris (25). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
GPO Aug 05 2008
ORDER denying 520 Motion for Return of Property Pursuant to Fed R Crim 41(g)as to Robin Wilson (7). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
GPO Jul 29 2010
ORDER Clarifying Presentence Investigation Report re 634 Motion to Amend/Correct Presentence Report as to Robin Wilson (7). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (JOwe)

Docket last updated: 02/26/2021 4:27 PM EST
Wednesday, July 13, 2005
1 1 ORDER with Motion by USA to Seal Complaint as to Richard Lonzo Burton, Will Franklin Ulmer, Kevin Maurice Burton, Jose Ramon Arana, Nicole Grayson, Paul Curtiss Baker, Deborah Robinson, Andrew Marzett, Jr, Ramarr Lanelle Franklin. Signed by Honorable Virginia M Morgan. (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER with Motion by USA to Seal Complaint as to Richard Lonzo Burton, Will Franklin Ulmer, Kevin Maurice Burton, Jose Ramon Arana, Nicole Grayson, Paul Curtiss Baker, Deborah Robinson, Andrew Marzett, Jr, Ramarr Lanelle Franklin. Signed by Honorable Virginia M Morgan. (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT sworn before Honorable Virginia M Morgan as to Richard Lonzo Burton (1), Will Franklin Ulmer (2), Kevin Maurice Burton (3), Jose Ramon Arana (4), Nicole Grayson (5), Paul Curtiss Baker (6), Deborah Robinson (7), Andrew Marzett, Jr (8), Ramarr Lanelle Franklin (9). (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT sworn before Honorable Virginia M Morgan as to Richard Lonzo Burton (1), Will Franklin Ulmer (2), Kevin Maurice Burton (3), Jose Ramon Arana (4), Nicole Grayson (5), Paul Curtiss Baker (6), Deborah Robinson (7), Andrew Marzett, Jr (8), Ramarr Lanelle Franklin (9). (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2005
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Adam Douglass. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : . Arraignment for Adam Douglass adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Brian Smith. Bond Info: Brian Smith (16) $10,000 unsecured. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Brian Smith adjourned to 7/22/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to David Watson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for David Watson adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Leon Pierce (a/k/a Jamil Carter). Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, ) Modified on 7/19/2005 (MLan, ).
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Jamil Carter (Leon Pierce) adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Jason Anderson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Robin Wilson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Appeared without counsel (to retain)) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Robin Wilson adjourned to7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Appeared without counsel (to retain)) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Deborah Robinson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Adam Douglass. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : . Arraignment for Adam Douglass adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Brian Smith. Bond Info: Brian Smith (16) $10,000 unsecured. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Brian Smith adjourned to 7/22/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to David Watson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for David Watson adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Leon Pierce (a/k/a Jamil Carter). Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, ) Modified on 7/19/2005 (MLan, ).
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Jamil Carter (Leon Pierce) adjourned to 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Jason Anderson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Robin Wilson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Appeared without counsel (to retain)) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Arraignment for Robin Wilson adjourned to7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Appeared without counsel (to retain)) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, )
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Donald A Scheer : Initial Appearance as to Deborah Robinson. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2005 01:00 PM. (Tape #: DAS 7/18/05) (Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Epstein) (AUSA: Janice Terbush) (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants sealing indictment and arrest warrants. Signed by Honorable Mona K Majzoub. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants sealing indictment and arrest warrants. Signed by Honorable Mona K Majzoub. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants unsealing indictment and arrest warrants. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants unsealing indictment and arrest warrants. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Quasand Daniell Lewis (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 10, 23, 27-28, Israel Corral (2) count(s) 1, 3, 17, Giovanni Ruanova (3) count(s) 1, 3, 5-7, 13, 16, Edward Walker (4) count(s) 1, 3, 5, 8-12, 14-15, 17-18, 24-25, Lavert Dafney (5) count(s) 1, 3, 13, 16, 27, Saeeda Walker (6) count(s) 1, 3-4, 19-23, 26-29, Robin Wilson (7) count(s) 1, 3, 6, Tulani Dismuke (8) count(s) 1, 3, 7, 9, Leon Pierce (9) count(s) 1, 22, 26-27, Jason Anderson (10) count(s) 1, 3, 21, 26, Ray Amerson (11) count(s) 1, 3, 19, 23, Mark Saldate (12) count(s) 1, 3, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell (13) count(s) 1, 3, 28-29, Jason Taylor (14) count(s) 1, 3, 11, 24-25, David Watson (15) count(s) 1, 3, 12, 15, Brian Smith (16) count(s) 1, 3, 14, 18, Jeffrey Redmond (17) count(s) 1, 3, 8, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez (18) count(s) 1, 3, Kahkuyan Brewer (19) count(s) 1, 3, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman (20) count(s) 1, 3, Adam Douglass (21) count(s) 1, 3, 20, Patricia Kay Guyton (22) count(s) 4, and Annette Sanchez (23) count(s) 3. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER with Motion by USA to Unseal2 Complaint, as to Richard Lonzo Burton, Will Franklin Ulmer, Kevin Maurice Burton, Jose Ramon Arana, Nicole Grayson, Paul Curtiss Baker, Deborah Robinson, Andrew Marzett, Jr, Ramarr Lanelle Franklin. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Quasand Daniell Lewis (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 10, 23, 27-28, Israel Corral (2) count(s) 1, 3, 17, Giovanni Ruanova (3) count(s) 1, 3, 5-7, 13, 16, Edward Walker (4) count(s) 1, 3, 5, 8-12, 14-15, 17-18, 24-25, Lavert Dafney (5) count(s) 1, 3, 13, 16, 27, Saeeda Walker (6) count(s) 1, 3-4, 19-23, 26-29, Robin Wilson (7) count(s) 1, 3, 6, Tulani Dismuke (8) count(s) 1, 3, 7, 9, Leon Pierce (9) count(s) 1, 22, 26-27, Jason Anderson (10) count(s) 1, 3, 21, 26, Ray Amerson (11) count(s) 1, 3, 19, 23, Mark Saldate (12) count(s) 1, 3, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell (13) count(s) 1, 3, 28-29, Jason Taylor (14) count(s) 1, 3, 11, 24-25, David Watson (15) count(s) 1, 3, 12, 15, Brian Smith (16) count(s) 1, 3, 14, 18, Jeffrey Redmond (17) count(s) 1, 3, 8, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez (18) count(s) 1, 3, Kahkuyan Brewer (19) count(s) 1, 3, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman (20) count(s) 1, 3, Adam Douglass (21) count(s) 1, 3, 20, Patricia Kay Guyton (22) count(s) 4, and Annette Sanchez (23) count(s) 3. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER with Motion by USA to Unseal2 Complaint, as to Richard Lonzo Burton, Will Franklin Ulmer, Kevin Maurice Burton, Jose Ramon Arana, Nicole Grayson, Paul Curtiss Baker, Deborah Robinson, Andrew Marzett, Jr, Ramarr Lanelle Franklin. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
4 4 REQUEST for warrant upon indictment by USA as to Quasand Daniell Lewis, Israel Corral, Giovanni Ruanova, Edward Walker, Lavert Dafney, Saeeda Walker, Robin Wilson, Tulani Dismuke, Leon Pierce, Jason Anderson, Ray Amerson, Mark Saldate, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell, Jason Taylor, David Watson, Brian Smith, Jeffrey Redmond, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez, Kahkuyan Brewer, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman, Patricia Kay Guyton, and Annette Sanchez; with attached copies of arrest warrants. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
4 4 REQUEST for warrant upon indictment by USA as to Quasand Daniell Lewis, Israel Corral, Giovanni Ruanova, Edward Walker, Lavert Dafney, Saeeda Walker, Robin Wilson, Tulani Dismuke, Leon Pierce, Jason Anderson, Ray Amerson, Mark Saldate, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell, Jason Taylor, David Watson, Brian Smith, Jeffrey Redmond, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez, Kahkuyan Brewer, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman, Patricia Kay Guyton, and Annette Sanchez; with attached copies of arrest warrants. (file-stamped 07/06/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) (DPer, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants sealing superseding indictment. (file-stamped 07/13/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) Signed by Honorable Virginia M Morgan. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants sealing superseding indictment. (file-stamped 07/13/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05) Signed by Honorable Virginia M Morgan. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants unsealing superseding indictment. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER WITH MOTION as to defendants unsealing superseding indictment. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
7 7 SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Quasand Daniell Lewis (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 10s, 23s, 27s-28s, Israel Corral (2) count(s) 1s, 3s, 17s, Giovanni Ruanova (3) count(s) 1s, 3s, 5s-7s, 13s, 16s, Edward Walker (4) count(s) 1s, 3s, 5s, 8s-12s, 14s-15s, 17s-18s, 24s-25s, Lavert Dafney (5) count(s) 1s, 3s, 13s, 16s, 27s, Saeeda Walker (6) count(s) 1s, 3s-4s, 19s-23s, 26s-29s, Robin Wilson (7) count(s) 1s, 3s, 6s, Tulani Dismuke (8) count(s) 1s, 3s, 7s, 9s, Leon Pierce (9) count(s) 1s, 22s, 26s-27s, Jason Anderson (10) count(s) 1s, 3s, 21s, 26s, Ray Amerson (11) count(s) 1s, 3s, 19s, 23s, Mark Saldate (12) count(s) 1s, 3s, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell (13) count(s) 1s, 3s, 28s-29s, Jason Taylor (14) count(s) 1s, 3s, 11s, 24s-25s, David Watson (15) count(s) 1s, 3s, 12s, 15s, Brian Smith (16) count(s) 1s, 3s, 14s, 18s, Jeffrey Redmond (17) count(s) 1s, 3s, 8s, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez (18) count(s) 1s, 3s, Kahkuyan Brewer (19) count(s) 1s, 3s, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman (20) count(s) 1s, 3s, Adam Douglass (21) count(s) 1s, 3s, 20s, Patricia Kay Guyton (22) count(s) 4s, and Annette Sanchez (23) count(s) 3s. (file-stamped 07/13/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05)(DPer, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
7 7 SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Quasand Daniell Lewis (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 10s, 23s, 27s-28s, Israel Corral (2) count(s) 1s, 3s, 17s, Giovanni Ruanova (3) count(s) 1s, 3s, 5s-7s, 13s, 16s, Edward Walker (4) count(s) 1s, 3s, 5s, 8s-12s, 14s-15s, 17s-18s, 24s-25s, Lavert Dafney (5) count(s) 1s, 3s, 13s, 16s, 27s, Saeeda Walker (6) count(s) 1s, 3s-4s, 19s-23s, 26s-29s, Robin Wilson (7) count(s) 1s, 3s, 6s, Tulani Dismuke (8) count(s) 1s, 3s, 7s, 9s, Leon Pierce (9) count(s) 1s, 22s, 26s-27s, Jason Anderson (10) count(s) 1s, 3s, 21s, 26s, Ray Amerson (11) count(s) 1s, 3s, 19s, 23s, Mark Saldate (12) count(s) 1s, 3s, Serina Monique-Yvonne Farrell (13) count(s) 1s, 3s, 28s-29s, Jason Taylor (14) count(s) 1s, 3s, 11s, 24s-25s, David Watson (15) count(s) 1s, 3s, 12s, 15s, Brian Smith (16) count(s) 1s, 3s, 14s, 18s, Jeffrey Redmond (17) count(s) 1s, 3s, 8s, Walter Arlequin-Sanchez (18) count(s) 1s, 3s, Kahkuyan Brewer (19) count(s) 1s, 3s, Rodolfo Arevalo-Guzman (20) count(s) 1s, 3s, Adam Douglass (21) count(s) 1s, 3s, 20s, Patricia Kay Guyton (22) count(s) 4s, and Annette Sanchez (23) count(s) 3s. (file-stamped 07/13/05 and unsealed per order on 07/18/05)(DPer, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Deborah Robinson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (KGeha, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Deborah Robinson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (KGeha, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Robin Wilson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Deborah Robinson Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (KGeha, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Robin Wilson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Deborah Robinson Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (KGeha, ) [2:05-mj-80647-VMM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Leon Pierce. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Leon Pierce. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Leon Pierce. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Leon Pierce. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Jason Anderson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Jason Anderson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Jason Anderson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Jason Anderson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to David Watson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to David Watson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to David Watson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to David Watson. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Brian Smith. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Brian Smith. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER setting conditions of release as to Brian Smith (16) $10,000.00 unsecured bond. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER setting conditions of release as to Brian Smith (16) $10,000.00 unsecured bond. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
20 20 BOND as to Brian Smith in the amount of $10,000.00 unsecured entered. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
20 20 BOND as to Brian Smith in the amount of $10,000.00 unsecured entered. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Adam Douglass. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Adam Douglass. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Adam Douglass. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION pending hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Adam Douglass. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DPer, )
Related: [-]