Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC v. TXTME TV LTD.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01024 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2017 5:05 AM CDT |
Plaintiff
Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TXTME TV LTD.
Terminated: 10/19/2016
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 10/19 11:55 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) due to case being dismissed without prejudice. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sm, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 10/19 11:53 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT Ordering that case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/19/2016. (sm, ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 10/19 11:52 AM
ORDER Granting6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC, TXTME TV LTD. terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/19/2016. (sm, ) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/17 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC(Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/27 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC. TXTME TV LTD. served on 9/26/2016, answer due 10/17/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/19 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to TXTME TV LTD.. (nkl, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/19 3:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 09/19 3:38 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/19 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TXTME TV LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5944872.), filed by Virtual Immersion Technologies LLC.(Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 09/19 3:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (nkl, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Mon 09/19 3:46 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |