Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brian T Fenimore
Case #: 4:03-bk-50965
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2003
Creditor Meeting:Oct 01, 2003
Converted:Jan 22, 2004
Terminated:Mar 14, 2022

Debtor
Atchison Casting Corporation
3811 South 48th Terrace
St. Joseph, MO 64503
Represented By
William Jeffrey Maloney
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Mark G. Stingley
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Kathryn B. Bussing
Husch Blackwell Sanders LLP
contact info
Cassandra L. Writz
Bryan Cave
contact info
Laurence M. Frazen
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Tricia A. Sherick
Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn
contact info
Debtor
ACC Administration, Inc., f/k/a Atchison Casting Corporation

,
Represented By
Mark G. Stingley
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Lisa A. Epps
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Cassandra L. Writz
Bryan Cave
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Logan & Company, Inc.
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP 1000 Walnut Suite 1400
Kansas City, MO 64106
Represented By
Daniel D. Doyle
Lashly & Baer, P.C.
contact info
Eric L. Johnson
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Scott J. Goldstein
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Lisa A. Epps
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP
1000 Walnut Suite 1400
Kansas City, MO 64106
Trustee
Erlene W. Krigel
Krigel & Krigel, P.C. 4520 Main Street Suite 700
Kansas City, MO 64111
Represented By
Kelsey P. Nazar
Krigel & Krigel, P.C.
contact info
William Jeffrey Maloney
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Jack B. Fishman
Jack B. Fishman & Associates
contact info
Mark G. Stingley
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Eric L. Johnson
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Kathryn B. Bussing
Husch Blackwell Sanders LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Flanigan
Polsinelli Shughart PC
contact info
Erlene W. Krigel
Krigel & Krigel, P.C.
contact info
Lisa A. Epps
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Robert D. Gaines
Krigel & Krigel
contact info
Cassandra L. Writz
Bryan Cave
contact info

GPO Oct 29 2007
Memorandum Order - Ordered that the $200,000 AmeriCast deposited into the registry of the Court pending the resolution of this dispute shall be disbursed to Harris, with interest accrued from the date the funds were deposited into the registry. So ORDERED by /s/ Jerry W. Venters. The Moving Party is Directed to Serve this Order on Parties NOT Receiving Electronic Notice. (related document(s)1900, 1912) (Harden, Debra) Modified on 10/29/2007 (Harden, Debra).

Docket last updated: 05/19/2017 5:35 PM CDT
Monday, August 04, 2003
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 03-50965 [other,volp11a] ( 830.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 0866B1351043, Filing Fee Amount 830.0 dollars (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Atchison Casting Corporation , At Time of Filing - Fee Due of 830.00 dollars. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/1/2003. Disclosure Statement due by 12/1/2003. Disclosure of Compensation due 8/19/2003.Verification of Matrix due 8/19/2003. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/19/2003. Schedules A-J due 8/19/2003.Verification of Schedules due 8/19/2003. Summary of schedules due 8/19/2003. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/19/2003. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Corporate Minutes
Att: 2 Appendix Nagel Waiver
Att: 3 Appendix Rada Waiver
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases Pursuantto Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Related [+] signed on 8/4/2003. PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR INSTRUCTIONS TO SERVE ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE. (Hinkle, Jamie)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Sherri Wattenbarger for United States Trustee. (Wattenbarger, Sherri)
Related: [-]
5 5 Emergency Motion to Change Divisional Venue from St. Joseph, to Kansas City, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Certain Motions and Applications Listed on Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Pursuant to Local Rule 1002-2B, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 Order of the Court Granting the Motion to Change Divisional Venue from St. Joseph Division to Kansas City, so ORDERED by /s/ Jerry W. Venters Related [+] (Hinkle, Jamie) THE MOVING PARTY IS TO SERVE THIS ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE. (When filing a certificate of service for this order, relate it back to the epo category.) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Related: [-] 5
8 8 Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing on Certain Motions and Applications Listed on Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Pursuant to Local Rule 1002-2B, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation; setting hearings on Tuesday, August 5, 2003 at 10:30 a.m.,as shown on the exhibi Related [+] signed on 8/4/2003. PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR INSTRUCTIONS TO SERVE ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE. (Hinkle, Jamie)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Atchison Casting Corporation. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 Equity Security Holders filed by Atchison Casting Corporation. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 Rule 2015-2 A and B filed by Atchison Casting Corporation. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Consolidated Cash Flow Statement
12 12 Application to Employ Mark G. Stingley and the Firm of Bryan Cave LLP as Attorneys for Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Mark G. Stingley as Attorney for Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Including Disclosure Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 and 2016 Disclosure, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Related [+]. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 Emergency Motion to Borrow Motion for Interim and Final Order Authorizing (1) Borrowing with Priority Over Administrative Expenses and Secured by Liens on Property of the Estates Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 364, (2) the Debtors' Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Therefor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 361 and 363, and (3) Modifying the Automatic Stay filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Responses due by 8/24/2003. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
15 15 Emergency Motion to Pay Financing Fee in Connection With Debtor in Possession Credit Facility filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 Motion for Order regarding Granting Debtors Authority to Enter Into Accommodation Agreement and Access and Security Agreement with Certain Customers, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
17 17 Emergency Motion for Order regarding (1) Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Cash Management Systems, (2) Authorizing Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts, Deposit Practices and Business Forms, and (3) Authorizing Continuation of Intercompany Transactions filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 Application to Employ James G. Morris and the Firm of KPMG LLP as Accountants For Debtors And Debtors In Possession, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James G. Morris
Att: 2 Exhibit C - May 21, 2003 Engagement Letter
Att: 3 Exhibit D - April 14, 2003 Engagement Letter
19 19 Application to Employ Alvarez & Marsal, Inc. as Financial Consultants for Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of William Romney
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter Agreement
20 20 Application to Employ the Firm of Blackwell Sanders Peper Martin LLP as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 Affidavit Re: Affidavit Of Jeffrey T. Haughey In Support Of Application To Employ Blackwell Sanders Peper Martin LLP As Special Counsel For Debtors And Debtors In Possession Including Disclosures Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 329 And Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 And 2016, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Related [+]. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-] 20
22 22 Application to Employ Lincoln Partners LLC as Investment Banker for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert B. Barr
Att: 2 Appendix Lincoln Partners Letter Agreement
23 23 Application to Employ W. Y. Campbell & Company as Investment Banker for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2003 (Harden, Debra).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian T. Dragon
24 24 Application to Employ Logan & Company, Inc. as (A) Outside Claims Agent Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 156(c) for Claims, Noticing, Balloting and Other Support Services and (B) Approving Related Agreement of Services Between Debtors and Logan & Company filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement for Services
25 25 Affidavit Re: Affidavit Of Kathleen M. Logan In Support Of Motion Of Debtors For An Order (A) Appointing Logan & Company, Inc. As Outside Claims Agent Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 156(C) For Claims, Noticing, Balloting And Other Support Services And (B) Approving Related Agreement Of Services Between Debtors And Logan & Company, Inc., filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Related [+]. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-] 24
26 26 Motion for Order regarding Authorizing Retention of Professionals Utilized by the Debtors in the Ordinary Course of Business, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
27 27 Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Current Income and Expenditures, Statements of Financial Affairs and Statements of Executory Contracts . Extension requested to filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
28 28 Motion for Order regarding (A) Authorizing Debtors to Operate Their Businesses and (B) Implementing the Automatic Stay, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
29 29 Emergency Motion for Order regarding Authorizing Atchison Casting Corporation ("ACC") to Vote Its Ownership Interests in Certain Non-Debtor Subsidiaries in Favor of Sale of Substantially All Assets of Such Non-Debtor Subsidiaries to Clarke Casting, LLC, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
30 30 Emergency Motion for Order regarding Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Claims and Workers' Compensation Claims and Continuation of Employee Benefit Plans, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
31 31 Motion to Authorize Debtors to Assume Contract with AIG Risk Management for Workers' Compensation Insurance Programs, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
32 32 Emergency Motion for Order regarding Approving Debtors' Method of Furnishing Adequate Assurance of Payment for Postpetition Utility Services, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
33 33 Motion to Pay Various Federal, State and Local Taxes pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 541 filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
34 34 Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S. C. Section 365(d)(4) . Extension requested to plan confirmation, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
35 35 WITHDRAWN Emergency Motion for Order regarding Authorizing Honor of Prepetition Customer Deposits, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark) Modified on 9/30/2003 (Lauderdale, Melinda).
Related: [-]
36 36 Motion for Order regarding Granting Administrative Claim in Lieu of Reclamation, and Approving Procedure for Allowing Such Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 546(c), filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
37 37 Motion for Order regarding Entry of Standing Order No. 1 to Establish Notice and Motion Procedures, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
38 38 Motion for Order regarding Approval of Standing Order No. 2 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Establishing Fee and Expense Guidelines, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-]
39 39 Affidavit Re: Affidavit Of Thomas K. Armstrong, Jr. In Support Of First Day Applications And Motions, filed by Atchison Casting Corporation Related [+]. (Stingley, Mark)
Related: [-] 14 ,33 ,16 ,17 ,35 ,18 ,36 ,2 ,19 ,20 ,22 ,23 ,24 ,26 ,12 ,29 ,30 ,31 ,32