New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:05-cr-01612
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2005
Terminated:Mar 20, 2007
Defendant
Hugo Aguirre Snayder
Defendant
Hugo Snyder-Aguirre
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Sep 22 2009
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Hugo Snyder-Aguirre re 92 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ( Civil Action 09-96.) by Magistrate Judge Don J. Svet Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2009 (mdm)
GPO May 14 2010
ORDER by District Judge Bruce D. Black denying Hugo Snyder-Aguirre's 92 Motion to Vacate (2255) and adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommended Disposition 99 (mjr)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.