New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:07-cr-00728
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2007
Claimant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant
"Changara"
Defendant
"Chino"
Defendant
"Chori"
Defendant
"Chorizo"
Defendant
"El Orejon"
Defendant
"El Paisa"
Defendant
"El Pollo"
Defendant
"El Viejo"
Defendant
"Garrincha"
Defendant
"La Muneca"
Defendant
"Las Plumas"
Defendant
"Liquadora"
Defendant
"Mango"
Defendant
"Pappas"
Defendant
"Primo"
Defendant
Aldemar Sanchez
Defendant
Alvaro N. Cabrera
Defendant
Cesar Augusto Gil Gomez
Defendant
Edison Valdes
Defendant
Eibar Guarin
Defendant
George Baquero
Defendant
Gustavo Adolfo Moreno-Pena
Defendant
Heiner Salazar
Defendant
John Montoya-Loaiza
Defendant
Jose Norman Lopez
Defendant
Luis Fernando Sanchez Ferrerosa
Defendant
Maria L. Blandon
Defendant
Maria Valdes
Defendant
Miguel Segovia
Defendant
Orlando Prado Cortez
Defendant
Roosevelt Carabali Ruiz
Defendant
Wilmer Uribe Pizarro
Interested Party
First Mortgage Strategies Group, Inc.
Interested Party
Wachovia Bank, N.A.
Interested Party
Washington Mutual Bank
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Dec 22 2008
JUDGMENT as to Wilmer Uribe Pizarro (4), Count(s) 1, 4, Underlying Indictment is dismissed on the motion of the U.S.; Count(s) 1s, Dismissed on the motion of the U.S.; Count(s) 4s, Imprisoned for a term of 21 months on count four of the superseding indictment(S-1). Dft is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Supervised Release of 3 years on Count 4 of the superseding indictment (S-1). Dft shall not possess a firearm or destructive device. The dft if deported may not re-enter the U.S. illegally. Special Assessment of $100.00.(Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/19/08) C/M (Piper, Francine)
GPO Dec 22 2008
JUDGMENT as to Cesar Augusto Gil Gomez (9), Count(s) 1, Any underlying indictment is dismissed on the motion of the U.S.; Count(s) 1s, Imprisoned for 135 months on Count one of the Superseding Indictment(S-1). The court recommends that, if consistent with bureau of prisons policy and practice, the dft be designated at a facility in the NY Metropolitan area. Dft is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. 5 years supervised release on Count One of the Superseding Indictment (S-1). Dft shall not possess a firearm or destructive device. The dft if deported may not re-enter the U.S. illegally. Special Assessment of $100.00. (Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/19/08) (Piper, Francine)
GPO Oct 29 2015
ORDER granting 240, 249 Motions to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment for Cesar Augusto Gil Gomez (9). Consistent with this Memorandum and Order, the court will issue an Amended Judgment reflecting a sentence of 120 months of imprisonment, with an effective date of November 1, 2015. The court does not alter any other portion of the December 19, 2008, Judgment (Dkt. 131 ), including the special conditions of supervised release and the $ 100 special assessment. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/29/2015. (c/m to pro se) (Lee, Tiffeny)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.