Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:11-cr-00063
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2011
Terminated:Oct 25, 2011
Defendant
Nichcole Starr Blackwell
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jun 01 2011
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Nichcole Starr Blackwell. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 6/1/2011) (wrb)
GPO Jun 16 2011
ORDER ACCEPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ADJUDGING DEFENDANT GUILTY: The sentence will be imposed in accordance with the Courts sentencing scheduling order. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 6/16/2011) (klm)

Docket last updated: 09/23/2022 11:41 AM CDT
Thursday, February 17, 2011
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nichole Starr Blackwell (1). (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2011
Arrest of Nichole Starr Blackwell (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2011
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Nichole Starr Blackwell held on 3/1/2011. Deft arrested 2/28/11; Deft executed financial affidavit; Gov't advises court that FPD has conflict; Court will appoint CJA attorney after hearing; Deft executed PR bond & advised of conditions of Pretrial release; O/setting conditions of pretrial release entered; Preliminary hearing set 3/11/11 at 2:00p.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; Deft released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith for Mike Worley; Defense - N/A. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) (USPO Amy Fonck) Time in Court - :05. (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nichole Starr Blackwell (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Nichole Starr Blackwell: Preliminary Hearing set for 3/11/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 3/1/2011) (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nichole Starr Blackwell (1)Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. (copy faxed USM 3/01/11) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 3/1/2011) (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Catherine R Dunnavant for Nichole Starr Blackwell. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judge's courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 3/1/2011) (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2011
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Nichole Starr Blackwell (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/28/11 as to Nichole Starr Blackwell. (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2011
10 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Return of an Indictment filed by Nichole Starr Blackwell (Dunnavant, Catherine) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Presentation of Charges to the Grand Jury Within Thirty Days Trial by Nichole Starr Blackwel.l (Dunnavant, Catherine) Modified text on 3/10/2011 (klm). [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2011
12 12 ORDER granting10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time for Return of an Indictment as to Nichole Starr Blackwell (1)....ORDERED...for the government to obtain the return of an Indictment....extended until April 29, 2011. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 3/10/2011) (jah) [4:11-mj-00043-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2011
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Nichole Starr Blackwell (1) count(s) 1. (klm)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Nichole Starr Blackwell:, ( Arraignment set for 4/20/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton.) (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 4/13/2011) (csw)
Related: [-]