Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:05-cr-01349
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2005
Terminated:Jan 19, 2006
Defendant
Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Aug 09 2005
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2005. ( Signed by Judge Felix Recio ) Parties notified. ( dflores )
GPO Aug 29 2005
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez for 12 Report and Recommendations. ( Signed by Judge George P. Kazen ) Parties notified. ( dflores )

Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 10:15 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 25, 2005
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez (1), filed. (nortiz, ) [5:05-mj-01367]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Adriana Arce-Flores :INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez,(Deft informed of rights) held on 5/25/2005, bond set at $75,000. c/s, Added attorney Federal Public Defenders - Laredo for Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez. Preliminary Examination set for 6/2/2005 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Marcel C. Notzon Appearances:N Sheldon, BP; G Wirsching, PTSO; G Lindberg, AUSA; R Garza, Federal Public Defenders - Laredo.(ERO:S Medellin) (Interpreter:A Adriano) Deft remanded to custody , filed.(nortiz, ) [5:05-mj-01367]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Federal Public Defenders - Laredo for Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez ( Signed by Judge Adriana Arce-Flores ). Parties notified. (nortiz, ) [5:05-mj-01367]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez, filed.(nortiz, ) [5:05-mj-01367]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2005
6 6 INDICTMENT as to Serafin Sanchez-Sanchez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (mmarquez, )
Related: [-]