Wilson v. Caldwell Correctional Center et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01321 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/18 8:39 AM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING9 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's civil rights Complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for hearing is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/17/17. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 12/22 2:48 PM
OBJECTION to9 Report and Recommendations by Kory Damont Wilson. Response to Objection to R&R due by 1/5/2017(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 12/05 1:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Kory Damont Wilson, RECOMMENDING that the complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/5/16. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/31 11:15 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $10.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/31/2016. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 10/27 9:51 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/27 9:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kory Damont Wilson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate Account Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Tue 10/11 9:08 AM
LETTER dated 10/4/2016 from Plaintiff to Court. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Wed 09/21 3:51 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign IFP application.Plaintiff submitted an IFP application not completed by an authorized Accounts Officer. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/21/16.(crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Application | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 09/21 8:49 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/20 5:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kory Damont Wilson.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/20 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Caldwell Correctional Center, Chris A Frederick, Grant, Martin filed by Kory Damont Wilson.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/21 8:45 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) |