New York Southern District Court
Judge:Robert W Sweet
Case #: 1:13-cv-07632
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2013
Terminated:Jan 27, 2014
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 7:09 AM EST
Defendant
Alydian Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Marco Aurelio Santori
Nesenoff & Miltenberg. LLP
contact info
Defendant
CLI Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Marco Aurelio Santori
Nesenoff & Miltenberg. LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coinlab, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Roger Townsend
Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC
contact info
Seth D. Ard
Susman Godfrey Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marco Aurelio Santori
Nesenoff & Miltenberg. LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Peter Vessenes
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Roger Townsend
Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC
contact info
Seth D. Ard
Susman Godfrey Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marco Aurelio Santori
Nesenoff & Miltenberg. LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bitvestment Partners LLC
Represented By
Bryan Isaac Reyhani
Reyhani Nemirovsky LLP
contact info
Danielle Janine Kiwak, MS.
Reyhani Nemirovsky LLP
contact info


1. The bitcoin race: 'Mining has gotten hypercompetitive very quickly' (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 11/06/2013
Docket last updated: 10/31/2013 7:23 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2013
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alydian Inc., CLI Holdings, Inc., Coinlab, Inc., John Doe, Peter Vessenes. (mqu)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (mqu)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (mqu)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Show Cause Hearing was held on 10/29/2013. ( Oral Argument is set for 11/20/2013 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.). (sc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Alydian Inc., CLI Holdings, Inc., Coinlab, Inc., John Doe, Peter Vessenes. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401080137)Document filed by Bitvestment Partners LLC.(mqu) (mqu).
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the Affidavit of Daniel H. Gallancy, in Support of Plaintiffs Application for an Order to Show Cause, dated October 28, 2013, the Declaration of Bryan Reyhani, Esq. dated October 29, 2013 and upon a copy of the Complaint filed herewith, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-named Defendants show cause before a motion term of this Court, at Room 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City, County and State of New York, on November 20, 2013, at noon thereof, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining CoinLab Inc. ("CoinLab"), CLI Holdings Inc. ("CLI Holdings"), Alydian Inc. ("Alydian"), and Peter Vessenes (collectively, "CoinLab") and John Doe (collectively "Defendants"), during the pendency of this action, from: Using Bitcoin mining output for operating expenses and capital expenditures; Transferring Bitcoins between and among themselves and to any third-parties; Transferring any other CoinLab assets to any third party, including cash on hand; Distributing mining equipment to third parties; Contracting with any other parties to fulfill any other mining obligations; and Requiring Defendants within 24 hours of being served with the notice to: Utilize best efforts and begin to mine and deliver Bitcoins to Bitvestment Provide Plaintiff with a comprehensive list of all Bitcoin addresses used by CoinLab and any and all affiliates and employees that mine or have mined Bitcoins since December 13, 2012, regardless of purpose of usage (i. e. whether the Bitcoin addresses are in usage for mining or otherwise), as well as the unencrypted private keys associated with those Bitcoin addresses; and Immediately identify the John Doe investor by its/his/her name and relevant contact information, including business address, mailing address, email address and telephone. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that email service of a copy of this order and all supporting documents upon Defendants or their counsel on or before 5pm on October 29, 2013 shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof; which service is hereby acknowledged by Defendants and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any responsive papers to this motion by Order to Show Cause shall be served by email on counsel for Plaintiff and filed with the Clerk, with a copy delivered to chambers, on or before November 14, at 11:59 a.m.; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any reply papers by Plaintiff shall be served by email on counsel for Defendants and filed with the Clerk, with a copy delivered to chambers, on or before November 19, at 5:00 p.m. Both sides are granted expedited discovery. (Show Cause Hearing set for 11/20/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/29/2013) (rsh)
Related: [-]