Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01478
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2016
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Advanced Disposal National
Represented By
Advanced Disposal National
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/20 11:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1478 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 12/20 10:26 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
11 11 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 10:37 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/03 4:42 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,6 Order Setting Requirements,9 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
9 9 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Wed 11/02 10:33 AM
Pluries Summons Issued on Advanced Disposal National Answer Due 12/2/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
8 8 order Issue Summons Order Wed 11/02 10:20 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Puries Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #7
Thursday, October 27, 2016
7 7 motion Issue Summons Thu 10/27 9:44 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Pluries Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
6 6 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/29 11:46 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Amended Summons Issued Thu 09/29 11:46 AM
Amended Summons Issued on Advanced Disposal National Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued
Saturday, September 24, 2016
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/25 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued on Advanced Disposal National Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk) Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Thursday, September 22, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/22 2:09 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/22 2:00 PM
Summons Issued on Advanced Disposal National Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/21 3:17 PM
Adversary case 16-01478 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Advanced Disposal National. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 09/21 4:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01478 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318148. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]