Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01479
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2016
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Boulevard Apparel, Inc.
Represented By
Boulevard Apparel, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/20 11:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1479 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 12/19 3:44 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
10 10 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 10:39 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 12:26 PM
Certificate of Service regarding the (i) Complaint, (ii) Alias Summons, (iii) Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial, and (iv) Order Granting and Modifying Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Uniform Procedures for Preference Adversary Proceedings [D.E. #1104, Main Case] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,5 Order Setting Requirements,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Monday, October 17, 2016
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Mon 10/17 11:55 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Boulevard Apparel, Inc. Answer Due 11/16/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
7 7 order Issue Summons Order Mon 10/17 11:53 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #6
Friday, October 14, 2016
6 6 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 11:38 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
5 5 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/29 11:48 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Amended Summons Issued Thu 09/29 11:48 AM
Amended Summons Issued on Boulevard Apparel, Inc. Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 22, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/22 2:15 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/22 2:14 PM
Summons Issued on Boulevard Apparel, Inc. Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/21 3:29 PM
Adversary case 16-01479 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Boulevard Apparel, Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 09/21 4:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01479 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318148. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]