Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01480
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2016
Terminated:Jan 18, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
CMS Mechanical Services, LLC
Represented By
CMS Mechanical Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/18 10:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1480 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Wed 01/04 4:48 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
20 20 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Tue 12/27 3:58 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 19 Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 12/20 2:54 PM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant CMS Mechanical Services, LLC (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01480 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A))
Thursday, December 15, 2016
17 17 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/15 8:40 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant CMS Mechanical Services, LLC Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01480 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/14 11:00 AM
Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
13 13 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 10:41 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 1:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,9 Order Setting Requirements,10 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Thursday, October 20, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/21 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Re:6 )
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
10 10 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 8:44 PM
Amended Alias Summons Issued on CMS Mechanical Services, LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. **Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01480 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
9 9 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 10/18 11:50 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 11:50 AM
Alias Summons Issued on CMS Mechanical Services, LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01480 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
7 7 order Issue Summons Order Tue 10/18 11:49 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #6
Friday, October 14, 2016
6 6 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 12:09 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
5 5 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/29 11:51 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Amended Summons Issued Thu 09/29 11:51 AM
Amended Summons Issued on CMS Mechanical Services, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 22, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/22 2:23 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/22 2:22 PM
Summons Issued on CMS Mechanical Services, LLC Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/21 3:37 PM
Adversary case 16-01480 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 09/21 4:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01480 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318148. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]