Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01481
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2016
Terminated:Apr 10, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Epicor Retail Software Corporation
Represented By
Epicor Retail Software Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 10, 2017
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/10 1:58 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1481 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 01/20 10:31 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Saturday, December 10, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/11 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re:11 )
Friday, December 09, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Thursday, December 08, 2016
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/08 4:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants Aptos Canada, Inc., Epicor Retail Software Corporation Related [+]. (Martinez-Monfort, Luis)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 12/08 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #11
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
12 12 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 10:42 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 12/01 3:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Lisa Wolgast Fee Amount $75 Filed by Defendant Aptos Canada, Inc. (Martinez-Monfort, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 12/01 3:41 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 16-01481 LMI) [motion,mprohac] ( 75.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28781898. Fee amount 75.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/30 4:14 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Filed by Aptos Canada, Inc.. (Martinez-Monfort, Luis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service regarding the (i) Complaint, (ii) Alias Summons, (iii) Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial, and (iv) Order Granting and Modifying Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Uniform Procedures for Preference Adversary Proceedings [D.E. #1104, Main Case] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,5 Order Setting Requirements,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Monday, October 17, 2016
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Mon 10/17 12:08 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Epicor Retail Software Corporation Answer Due 11/16/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
7 7 order Issue Summons Order Mon 10/17 12:06 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #6
Friday, October 14, 2016
6 6 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 11:33 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
5 5 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/29 11:54 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Amended Summons Issued Thu 09/29 11:53 AM
Amended Summons Issued on Epicor Retail Software Corporation Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 22, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 09/22 2:29 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/22 2:28 PM
Summons Issued on Epicor Retail Software Corporation Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/21 3:54 PM
Adversary case 16-01481 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Epicor Retail Software Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 09/21 4:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01481 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318148. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]