Berk v. Hot Chocolate, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01487 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Hot Chocolate, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Notice of Filing Satisfaction of Judgment , Filed by Defendant Hot Chocolate, Inc..(Kretzschmar., Catherine) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/18 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1487 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Sunday, January 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Entry (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Hot Chocolate. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Entry (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Hot Chocoate, Inc. . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Saturday, December 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Hot Chocolate, Inc. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Alias Summons Issued on Hot Chocolate, Inc. Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.**Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Alias Summons Issued on Hot Chocolate, Inc. Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Amended Summons Issued on Hot Chocolate, Inc. Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Hot Chocolate, Inc. Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01487 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Hot Chocolate, Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 09/21 4:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01487 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318148. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |