Berk v. Nadia, Inc. d/b/a/ Industrial Staffing of Alabama,
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01490 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nadia, Inc. d/b/a/ Industrial Staffing of Alabama, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/20 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1490 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Nadia, Inc. d/b/a Industrial Staffing of Alabama, Inc.) Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Amended Summons Issued on Nadia, Inc. d/b/a/ Industrial Staffing of Alabama, Inc. Answer Due 10/31/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Nadia, Inc. d/b/a/ Industrial Staffing of Alabama, Inc. Answer Due 10/24/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01490 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Nadia, Inc. d/b/a/ Industrial Staffing of Alabama, Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 09/21 5:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01490 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28318536. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |