Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:14-bk-81783

Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas L Saladino
Case #: 8:16-ap-08051
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2016
Terminated:Jul 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mohsen Niroomand-Rad
1807 North 96th Street
Omaha, NE 68114
Represented By
Mohsen Niroomand-Rad
contact info
Defendant
Michael Niroomand-Rad
8518 Hamilton Street
Omaha, NE 68114
Represented By
Michael Niroomand-Rad
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Niroomand-Rad
14370 Salem Avenue
Savage, MN 55378
Represented By
Ryan Niroomand-Rad
contact info
Defendant
USA Construction Company Incorporated
1807 N 96th St.
Omaha, NE 68114
Represented By
USA Construction Company Incorporated
contact info
Defendant
Xion Construction Company, LLC
3749 North 56th Street
Omaha, NE 68104
Represented By
Xion Construction Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Represented By
John Does 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph H. Badami, Trustee
Rex J. Moats Moats Law Firm, PC, LLO P.O. Box 307
Elkhorn, NE 68022
Represented By
Rex J. Moats
Moats Law Firm, Pc Llo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Thursday, July 26, 2018
25 25 notice Certificate of Service Thu 07/26 6:50 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers Related [+] (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/25 2:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers Related [+]. The motion to dismiss adversary proceeding is granted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice as to all parties with each party bearing his or its own costs. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (see pdf order in its entirety) (drs)
Related: [-] 23
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/25 3:21 PM
Disposition of Adversary A16-8051 Myers v. Niroomand-Rad et al CASE DISMISSED on 7/25/2018 . (jea)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/25 3:21 PM
Adversary Case Closed A16-8051 Myers v. Niroomand-Rad et al CASE DISMISSED on 7/25/2018 . (jea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
23 23 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/24 8:05 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
22 22 notice Certificate of Service Thu 01/18 8:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers Related [+] (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy
21 21 order Compromise Controversy Thu 01/18 4:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Richard D. Myers, Successor Ch. 7 Trustee Related [+]. Hearing held January 18, 2018. Mohsen Noroomand-Rad, Debtor in BK14-81784 appeared; Rex Moats & Margaret McDevitt appeared for Trustee Richard Myers; Jerry Jensen for UST; Michael Eversden appeared for Michael Niroomand-Rad, Ryan Niroomand-Rad and Xion Construction Co., LLC. Evidence admitted: Fil. #136, 138 in BK14-81783. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion for approval of compromise is granted. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 15
20 20 audio Thu 01/18 2:32 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 10:05:18 AM ]. File Size [ 20343 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:24:46 ]. (CRTclerk)
Related: [-]
court Courts Certificate Of Mailing (text event) Thu 01/18 4:21 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of related document to Defendant Mohsen Niroomand-Rad, 1807 N 96th St., Omaha, NE 68114 Related [+] (dkk)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
19 19 court Hearing Set Tue 12/19 4:16 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at Omaha Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Affidavit evidence due by 1/12/2018. (See PDF) (dkk)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Approval of Compromise by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers, Successor Ch. 7 Trustee
court Courts Certificate Of Mailing (text event) Tue 12/19 4:19 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of related document to Defendant Mohsen Niroomand-Rad, 1807 N 96th St., Omaha, NE 68114 Related [+] (dkk)
Related: [-] 19 Hearing (Bk)
Monday, November 27, 2017
18 18 notice Certificate of Service Mon 11/27 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers Related [+] (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-] 17 Administrative Order Text Only
17 17 order Administrative Order Text Only Mon 11/27 3:00 PM
Order Motion for Approval of Compromise by Richard D. Myers, Successor Ch. 7 Trustee Related [+]. The motion cannot be considered by the court until it is filed in the underlying bankruptcy cases and served on all creditors and parties in interest. The objection by Mohsen and his request for hearing in 16-8050 will be deferred until the motion to approve compromise is properly served in each case. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Approval of Compromise filed by Richard D. Myers, Successor Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
16 16 court Deficiency Notice Wed 10/25 3:20 PM
Deficiency Notice. Related [+]. (jea)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers
15 15 motion Compromise Controversy Wed 10/25 9:36 AM
Motion to Compromise Controversy , Notice of Objection/Resistance Deadline, and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers 9013 Objections due by 11/15/2017. (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement and Mutual Release Agreement
Sunday, September 24, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/24 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Court's Certificate of Mailing
Friday, September 22, 2017
13 13 court Courts Certificate Of Mailing Fri 09/22 12:08 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing to Defendants Related [+]. (drs)
Related: [-] 12 Administrative Order Text Only
12 12 order Administrative Order Text Only Fri 09/22 12:07 PM
Order Related [+]. The court hereby enters this order staying further proceedings in this adversary proceeding, pending the outcome of the companion proceeding at AP16-8050. Any party may request lifting of this stay by motion at any time. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joseph H. Badami, Trustee
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
11 11 order Default Judgment Tue 12/20 3:42 PM
Order Denying Motion For Default Judgment re Defendants Mohsen Niroomand-Rad, Michael Niroomand-Rad, Ryan Niroomand-Rad, and Xion Construction Company, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers Related [+]. The motion for default judgment is denied, without prejudice. While it does appear that the defendants have not answered or otherwise filed a pleading within the appropriate time, the amount of damages have not been liquidated or otherwise determined. The court will not enter judgment until all issues as to all defendants have been resolved and damages determined. Further, it appears there is a companion adversary proceeding dealing with many if not all of the same issues and parties (AP 16-8050 in which case the defendants are not in default. Consolidation of the proceedings may be appropriate as it appears the evidence offered will be the same in each proceeding. The court will await a further motion by an interested party. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, December 16, 2016
10 10 misc Affidavit Fri 12/16 3:44 PM
Affidavit of Rex J. Moats in Support of Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Rex J. Moats on behalf of Richard D. Myers. Related [+] (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/16 3:42 PM
Motion for Default Judgment re Defendants Mohsen Niroomand-Rad, Michael Niroomand-Rad, Ryan Niroomand-Rad, and Xion Construction Company, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Myers (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
utility Terminate Party Thu 12/01 11:37 AM
Terminated party: Joseph H. Badami, Trustee terminated . (lms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/23 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Xion Construction Company, LLC 9/22/2016 . (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/23 1:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on USA Construction Company Incorporated 9/22/2016 . (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/23 1:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ryan Niroomand-Rad 9/22/2016 . (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/23 1:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mohsen Niroomand-Rad 9/22/2016 . (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/23 1:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Michael Niroomand-Rad 9/22/2016 . (Moats, Rex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 09/22 12:29 PM
Summons Issued on John Does 1-10 Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016; Michael Niroomand-Rad Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016; Mohsen Niroomand-Rad Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016; Ryan Niroomand-Rad Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016; USA Construction Company Incorporated Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016; Xion Construction Company, LLC Date Issued 9/22/2016, Answer Due 10/22/2016 . (jea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 09/21 2:56 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-08051 TLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 6941507, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/21 2:53 PM
Adversary case 16-08051 Complaint by Joseph H. Badami, Trustee against Mohsen Niroomand-Rad, Michael Niroomand-Rad, Ryan Niroomand-Rad, USA Construction Company Incorporated, Xion Construction Company, LLC, John Does 1-10. NOS: 11 Related [+]. Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Joseph H. Badami, Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment))(Moats, Rex)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property