Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-16749

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:16-ap-01431
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2016
Terminated:Jan 28, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 4:46 AM PST
Defendant
Fidelity Mortgage Lenders, Inc.
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & Mcrae LLP 6420 Wilshire Blvd., 17th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90048
Represented By
Patric J Kelly
contact info
Fidelity Mortgage Lenders, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
H.B.T.D Fund 1 LLC
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & Mcrae LLP 6420 Wilshire Blvd., 17th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90048
Represented By
Kevin S Sinclair
Sinclair Braun LLP
contact info
H.B.T.D Fund 1 LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jack William Purcell and Cheryl E. Purcell, Trustees of the Parcel Family Trust dated July 22, 1992
Represented By
Kevin S Sinclair
Sinclair Braun LLP
contact info
Jack William Purcell and Cheryl E. Purcell, Trustees of the Parcel Family Trust dated July 22, 1992
contact info
Defendant
Polycomp Trust Company Custodian FBO David L. Swartz, IRA
Represented By
Kevin S Sinclair
Sinclair Braun LLP
contact info
Polycomp Trust Company Custodian FBO David L. Swartz, IRA
contact info
Defendant
Howard Banchik or Steven Fogel, Trustees of Westwood Financial Corporation Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By
Kevin S Sinclair
Sinclair Braun LLP
contact info
Howard Banchik or Steven Fogel, Trustees of Westwood Financial Corporation Profit Sharing Plan
contact info
Defendant
Polycomp Trust Company Custodian FBO Marcie Polier Swartz, IRA
Represented By
Kevin S Sinclair
Sinclair Braun LLP
contact info
Polycomp Trust Company Custodian FBO Marcie Polier Swartz, IRA
contact info
Interested Party
Courtesy NEF
Represented By
Patric J Kelly
contact info
Intervenor-Plaintiff
DiaDan Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By
David J Richardson
Bakerhostetler
contact info
Mark S Horoupian
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward M. Wolkowitz
10250 Constellation Blvd. Ste. 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
M Douglas Flahaut
Arent Fox, LLP
contact info
Aram Ordubegian
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Andy Kong
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, January 28, 2019
133 133 court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/28 3:07 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-1431 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (May, Thais D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edward M. Wolkowitz,5 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Edward M. Wolkowitz, Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued, Hearing (Adv Other) Continued, Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued, Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued,106 Transcript,126 Transcript