Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: H Bruce Guyton
Case #: 3:13-cv-00656
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2013
Terminated:Feb 17, 2015
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 7:43 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Nautique Boat Company, Inc
Represented By
Ryan T Santurri
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
J Ford Little
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Brian R Gilchrist
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Malibu Boats, LLC
Represented By
Ioanna S Bouris
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Thomas Martin Gautreaux
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC
contact info
Mark Lezama
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Benjamin B Anger
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Hans Mayer
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Douglas G Muehlhauser
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
John P Konvalinka
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC
contact info
Laura E Hall
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Defendant
Nautique Boat Company, Inc
Represented By
Ryan T Santurri
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
J Ford Little
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Brian R Gilchrist
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A.
contact info
J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Malibu Boats, LLC
Represented By
Ioanna S Bouris
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Thomas Martin Gautreaux
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC
contact info
Mark Lezama
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Benjamin B Anger
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Hans Mayer
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
Douglas G Muehlhauser
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info
John P Konvalinka
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC
contact info
Laura E Hall
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, Llp (irvine)
contact info

GPO Jan 16 2014
MEMORANDUM & ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin 4 is GRANTED under the first-to-file doctrine. Defendant's Motion to Transfer 18 is DENIED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/16/14. (ABF)
GPO Feb 04 2014
MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/4/14. (ABF)
GPO Aug 06 2014
MEMORANDUM, OPINION & ORDER denying Defendant's 58 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/6/14. (ABF)

1. Nautique, Malibu settle patent litigation - Orlando Business Journal (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Mon 02/09/2015
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 19, 2015
228 228 misc Patent and Trademark Notice Thu 02/19 11:09 AM
PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding determination of this civil action. (AYB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
227 227 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/17 4:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Malibu Boats, LLC. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
226 226 misc Transcript Thu 02/12 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 13, 2015, Motion, before Judge H. Bruce Guyton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Netta Kocuba, Telephone number 865-524-4590. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.tned.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/5/2015 . Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2015 . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2015 . (NK)
Related: [-]