Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01496
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Sep 20, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chase Card Services
Represented By
Chase Card Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
38 38 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/20 11:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1496 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
37 37 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 08/31 1:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
36 36 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/03 2:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bank USA, N.A. 4/3/2017 Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk, Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
35 35 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 04/03 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Daniel N Gonzalez Esq Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 30 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,31 Amended Summons Issued,32 Order Setting Requirements
Sunday, April 02, 2017
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/03 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date .
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/03 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Amended Summons Issued on Chase Bank USA, N.A. Answer Due 5/1/2017; Chase Card Services Answer Due 5/1/2017 (Re:19 Amended Pluries Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 1/23/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk) Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.,30 Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential and Fraudulent Transfers (Second Amended) by Charles M. Berk against Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Card Services. Complaint Amended to Add Chase Bank USA, N.A. as a Defendant.) Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, March 31, 2017
32 32 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 03/31 3:01 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
31 31 court Amended Summons Issued Fri 03/31 3:00 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Chase Bank USA, N.A. Answer Due 5/1/2017; Chase Card Services Answer Due 5/1/2017 Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 19 Amended Pluries Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 1/23/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk) Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.,30 Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential and Fraudulent Transfers (Second Amended) by Charles M. Berk against Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Card Services. Complaint Amended to Add Chase Bank USA, N.A. as a Defendant.
Thursday, March 30, 2017
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/30 11:55 AM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential and Fraudulent Transfers (Second Amended) by Charles M. Berk against Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Card Services. Complaint Amended to Add Chase Bank USA, N.A. as a Defendant. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
29 29 misc Document Tue 03/28 9:29 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Mediator James P. S. Leshaw. (Leshaw, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
28 28 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 03/20 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Daniel N Gonzalez Esq Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Thursday, March 16, 2017
27 27 order Continue Hearing Order Thu 03/16 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (23 Amended Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 09/06/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
26 26 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 03/07 2:35 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Daniel N Gonzalez Esq Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Hearing
Monday, March 06, 2017
25 25 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 03/06 3:26 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
24 24 motion Continue Hearing Mon 03/06 3:24 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/10 12:51 PM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential and Fraudulent Transfers by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. Complaint Amended to Add Additional Counts. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
22 22 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/04 5:42 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Card Services 12/30/2016 Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk, Defendant Chase Card Services. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
21 21 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 01/04 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Daniel N Gonzalez Esq Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,16 Order Setting Requirements,18 Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney,19 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
20 20 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 12/28 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Daniel N Gonzalez Esq Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Issue Summons, Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Friday, December 23, 2016
19 19 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Fri 12/23 11:52 AM
Amended Pluries Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 1/23/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Thursday, December 22, 2016
18 18 order Substitute Attorney Order Thu 12/22 3:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney. Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #17
Monday, December 19, 2016
17 17 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 12/19 4:02 PM
Agreed Motion To Substitute Attorney Daniel N. Gonzalez, Esq. for Attorney Steven J. Solomon, Esq.. Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
16 16 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 12/15 8:08 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Thu 12/15 8:08 AM
Pluries Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 1/17/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01496 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
14 14 order Continue Hearing Order Thu 12/15 8:04 AM
Ex-Parte Order Granting Second Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Summons Related [+], Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (1 Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #13
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
13 13 motion Continue Hearing Wed 12/14 2:48 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Pluries Summons , in addition to Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Gonzalez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
11 11 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 11:25 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/22 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Alias Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01496 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)) Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. **Amended to correct pre-trial time**
Thursday, October 20, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/21 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Re:4 )
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 8:19 PM
Amended Alias Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. **Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01496 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
7 7 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 10/18 11:07 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 11:06 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01496 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
5 5 order Issue Summons Order Tue 10/18 11:04 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, October 14, 2016
4 4 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 2:07 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 10:39 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 10:37 AM
Summons Issued on Chase Card Services Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 10:38 AM
Adversary case 16-01496 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Chase Card Services. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 11:32 AM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01496 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28352674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]