Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01497
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Feb 06, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Project 28 Clothing, LLC
Represented By
Project 28 Clothing, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
45 45 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/06 8:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1497 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
44 44 notice Notice of Filing Thu 11/30 9:13 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment , Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-] 41 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant PROJECT 28 CLOTHING, LLC.,42 Notice of Entry (Re:41 Default Final Judgment)
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/26 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Notice of Entry (Re:41 Default Final Judgment)
Monday, October 23, 2017
42 42 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 10/23 12:53 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 41 Default Final Judgment
41 41 order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 10/23 12:52 PM
Default Final Judgment Against Defendant PROJECT 28 CLOTHING, LLC . (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 21, 2017
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Notice of Entry (Re:35 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC .)
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC .
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Notice of Entry (Re:35 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC .)
Thursday, October 19, 2017
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/19 1:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,35 Default Judgment,36 Notice of Entry of Judgment
36 36 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Thu 10/19 10:05 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 35 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC .
35 35 order Default Judgment [Order] Thu 10/19 10:04 AM
Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/19 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant (Re:31 )
Monday, October 16, 2017
33 33 order Default Judgment Order Mon 10/16 9:32 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #31
Friday, October 06, 2017
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/07 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk)
Thursday, October 05, 2017
31 31 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/05 2:36 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Project 28 Clothing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
30 30 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 10/04 2:11 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
29 29 motion Default Tue 10/03 10:18 AM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/27 12:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,21 Order on Miscellaneous Motion,26 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,27 Order Setting Requirements
27 27 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 07/27 10:28 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Thu 07/27 10:28 AM
Pluries Summons Issued on Project 28 Clothing, LLC Answer Due 8/28/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
25 25 order Issue Summons Order Thu 07/27 10:23 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Summons and Reschedule Pretrial Conference Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #24
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
24 24 motion Issue Summons Wed 07/26 1:09 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Pluries Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 19, 2017
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/20 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Denying Motion for Default Final Judgment and Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default Re:18
Friday, February 17, 2017
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/17 10:42 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
21 21 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Fri 02/17 8:16 AM
Order Denying Motion for Default Final Judgment and Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default Re: #18 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
20 20 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 12/28 6:26 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 18 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,19 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
19 19 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 12/27 11:57 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 18 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 12/20 2:55 PM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01497 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Project 28 Clothing, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A))
Thursday, December 15, 2016
16 16 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/15 10:22 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Project 28 Clothing, LLC Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01497 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Project 28 Clothing, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/14 11:04 AM
Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
12 12 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 11:26 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,8 Order Setting Requirements,9 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Thursday, October 20, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/21 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Re:5 )
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
9 9 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 8:24 PM
Amended Alias Summons Issued on Project 28 Clothing, LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. **Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01497 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Project 28 Clothing, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
8 8 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 10/18 11:11 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 11:10 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Project 28 Clothing, LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01497 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Project 28 Clothing, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
6 6 order Issue Summons Order Tue 10/18 11:08 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #5
Friday, October 14, 2016
5 5 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 2:19 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
4 4 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 10:47 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 10:44 AM
**Duplicate of DE #2**Summons Issued on Project 28 Clothing, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) Modified on 9/28/2016 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 10:42 AM
Summons Issued on Project 28 Clothing, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 10:44 AM
Adversary case 16-01497 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Project 28 Clothing, LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 11:32 AM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01497 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28352674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]