Berk v. Mirage Fashion of NY LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01500 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mirage Fashion of NY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/07 10:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1500 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (with prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Schatzman, Robert) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Alias Summons Issued on Mirage Fashion of NY LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.**Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Alias Summons Issued on Mirage Fashion of NY LLC Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued on Mirage Fashion of NY LLC Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Lebron, Lorraine) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Lebron, Lorraine) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01500 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Mirage Fashion of NY LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 09/27 11:32 AM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01500 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28352674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |