Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01503
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Apr 10, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Poetry Corporation
Represented By
Poetry Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, December 20, 2019
29 29 notice Notice of Filing Mon 12/23 5:20 PM
Notice and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment, Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 23 Default Judgment
Thursday, November 14, 2019
28 28 notice Notice of Filing Fri 11/15 11:10 AM
Notice and Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment, Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 23 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant POETRY CORPORATION .
Sunday, October 08, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/09 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant POETRY CORPORATION .
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/09 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant POETRY CORPORATION .)
Friday, October 06, 2017
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/06 12:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 23 Default Judgment,24 Notice of Entry of Judgment
24 24 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 10/06 11:05 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-] 23 Default Final Judgment Against Defendant POETRY CORPORATION .
23 23 order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 10/06 11:02 AM
Default Final Judgment Against Defendant POETRY CORPORATION . (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/10 1:32 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1503 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/22 11:32 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
20 20 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Wed 02/22 10:04 AM
Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Re: #17 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
19 19 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 12/28 6:27 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 17 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,18 Notice of Hearing
18 18 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 12/28 12:10 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 17 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 12/20 3:02 PM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Poetry Corporation (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01503 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Poetry Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A))
Thursday, December 15, 2016
15 15 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/15 10:39 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Poetry Corporation Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01503 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Poetry Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/14 11:10 AM
Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:31 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
11 11 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 11:39 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 3:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,7 Order Setting Requirements,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Thursday, October 20, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/21 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons (Re:4 )
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 8:37 PM
Amended Alias Summons Issued on Poetry Corporation Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. **Amended to correct pre-trial time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01503 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Poetry Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
7 7 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 10/18 11:39 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Tue 10/18 11:39 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Poetry Corporation Answer Due 11/17/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01503 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Poetry Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
5 5 order Issue Summons Order Tue 10/18 11:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #4
Friday, October 14, 2016
4 4 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 3:41 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 3:01 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Marva
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 3:00 PM
Summons Issued on Poetry Corporation Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berkynolds, Marva
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:15 AM
Adversary case 16-01503 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Poetry Corporation. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 11:32 AM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01503 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28352674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]