Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01509
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Mar 15, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
K Too
Represented By
K Too
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/15 12:47 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1509 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/10 2:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
Sunday, January 08, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/09 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Re:14
Friday, January 06, 2017
15 15 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Fri 01/06 9:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Re: #14 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 12/20 3:05 PM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant K-Too (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01509 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against K Too. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A))
Thursday, December 15, 2016
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/15 10:41 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant K-Too Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01509 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against K Too. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/14 11:13 AM
Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
8 8 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 11:55 AM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 3:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,3 Order Setting Requirements,6 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
6 6 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Wed 10/19 11:20 AM
Alias Summons Issued on K Too Answer Due 11/18/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
5 5 order Issue Summons Order Wed 10/19 11:19 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #4
Friday, October 14, 2016
4 4 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 3:57 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 4:44 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Marva
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 4:43 PM
Summons Issued on K Too. Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berkynolds, Marva
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:16 PM
Adversary case 16-01509 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against K Too. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 1:04 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01509 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28354297. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]