Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01512
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Jan 18, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Excell Brands LLC
Represented By
Excell Brands LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/18 10:31 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1512 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 01/05 8:54 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
8 8 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 12:20 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 4:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,3 Order Setting Requirements,6 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
6 6 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Wed 10/19 11:59 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Excell Brands LLC Answer Due 11/18/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
5 5 order Issue Summons Order Wed 10/19 11:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #4
Friday, October 14, 2016
4 4 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 4:02 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 6:27 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Marva
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 6:24 PM
Summons Issued on Excell Brands LLC. Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berkynolds, Marva
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:30 PM
Adversary case 16-01512 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Excell Brands LLC. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 1:04 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01512 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28354297. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]