Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01516
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Feb 06, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Krush NY, Inc.
Represented By
Krush NY, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
33 33 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/06 8:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1516 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 21, 2017
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Notice of Entry (Re:28 Default Judgment)
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Notice of Entry (Re:28 Default Judgment)
Thursday, October 19, 2017
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/19 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,28 Default Judgment,29 Notice of Entry of Judgment
29 29 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Thu 10/19 10:22 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 28 Default Judgment
28 28 order Default Judgment [Order] Thu 10/19 10:20 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Krush NY. Inc. . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Default Judgment Order Thu 10/19 10:08 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #25
Friday, October 06, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/07 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Krush, NY, Inc. (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk)
Thursday, October 05, 2017
25 25 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/05 2:34 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Krush NY, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
24 24 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 10/04 2:16 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Krush, NY, Inc. Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
23 23 motion Default Tue 10/03 10:21 AM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Krush NY, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/27 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,16 Order on Miscellaneous Motion,20 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,21 Order Setting Requirements
21 21 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 07/27 10:31 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
20 20 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Thu 07/27 10:30 AM
Pluries Summons Issued on Krush NY, Inc. Answer Due 8/28/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
19 19 order Issue Summons Order Thu 07/27 10:29 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons and Reschedule Pretrial Conference Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #18
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
18 18 motion Issue Summons Wed 07/26 1:08 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/17 10:41 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
16 16 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Fri 02/17 8:15 AM
Order Denying Motion for Final Judgment and Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default Re: #14 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/06 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Defandant KRUSH NY, INC. (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk)
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 01/04 11:28 AM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/03 12:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Clerk's Entry of Default
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 01/03 8:16 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Defandant KRUSH NY, INC. Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/21 12:59 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:42 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
8 8 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 12:29 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,3 Order Setting Requirements,6 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
6 6 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued Wed 10/19 1:48 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Krush NY, Inc. Answer Due 11/18/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
5 5 order Issue Summons Order Wed 10/19 1:47 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] #4
Friday, October 14, 2016
4 4 motion Issue Summons Fri 10/14 4:16 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 1:22 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 1:21 PM
Summons Issued on Krush NY, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 2:08 PM
Adversary case 16-01516 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Krush NY, Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 2:44 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01516 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28356195. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]