Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01529
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel
Represented By
Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/20 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1529 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
7 7 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 1:50 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 10/04 5:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date .
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued on Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01529 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)) Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 09/28 10:48 AM
Summons Issued on Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel Answer Due 10/28/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Lebron, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01529 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
2 2 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 09/28 10:45 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Lebron, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:06 PM
Adversary case 16-01529 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Camilia Apparel,Inc. dba Wild Rose Apparel. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/27 4:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01529 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28358241. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]